Starrett v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Mose Garlin Starrett
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 5:2019cv00964
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL by Mose Garlin Starrett. (Stoller, Paul)
December 4, 2019 Filing 25 DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 1/8/2020 11:00 AM in Chambers before Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti. Status Report due by 1/6/2020. (mb)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Paul L. Stoller. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 12/2/19. (kmt)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ashley C.Crowell. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 12/2/19. (kmt)
November 27, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Paul L. Stoller Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-3045124 by Mose Garlin Starrett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Rust, Andrea)
November 27, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Ashley C. Crowell Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-3045118 by Mose Garlin Starrett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Rust, Andrea)
November 26, 2019 Filing 20 ENTRY of Appearance by Andrea R Rust on behalf of Mose Garlin Starrett (Rust, Andrea)
November 20, 2019 Filing 19 ENTRY of Appearance by Stephanie R Smiley on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Smiley, Stephanie)
November 18, 2019 Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by Hiba Kazim on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Kazim, Hiba)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel Following Remand. Attorney Richard B. North, Jr terminated. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 11/14/19. (kmt)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Hiba Kazim. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 11/13/19. (kmt)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of StephanieR. Smiley. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 11/13/19. (kmt)
October 28, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitution of Counsel by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Buchan, J)
October 28, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Request for Admission)(Buchan, J)
October 28, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-3024712 by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Request for Admission)(Buchan, J)
October 28, 2019 Filing 11 STRICKEN, attorney filed in error 10/28/19 (kmt). MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-3024585 by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Request for Admission)(Buchan, J)
October 28, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated . (Buchan, J)
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by C R Bard Incorporated . (Buchan, J)
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Micah J Petersen on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Petersen, Micah)
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by J Craig Buchan on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Buchan, J)
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 Civil Docket Sheet for District of Arizona Case: 2:15-md-02641-DGC. (kmt)
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:18-cv-04311.
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 Suggestion of Remand and Transfer Order (second) from the District of Arizona: MDL 15-02641-PHX-DGC. (kmt)
October 22, 2019 Remark: Case transferred to the Western District of Oklahoma via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/23/2019.]
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (SECOND). (See document for details). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 10/17/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/23/2019.]
December 2, 2018 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-18-4311-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/23/2019.]
December 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16257122 filed by Mose Garlin Starrett. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/23/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Starrett v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Micah J Petersen
Represented By: J Craig Buchan
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Stephanie R Smiley
Represented By: Hiba Kazim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Micah J Petersen
Represented By: J Craig Buchan
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Stephanie R Smiley
Represented By: Hiba Kazim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mose Garlin Starrett
Represented By: John A Dalimonte
Represented By: Paul Lincoln Stoller
Represented By: Andrea R Rust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?