Nightingale v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Deberah Nightingale
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 5:2019cv00965
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by Hiba Kazim on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Kazim, Hiba)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER within seven (7) days from the dateof this Order, Plaintiffs counsel are directed to file their entry of appearances in accordance with LCvR 83.4 and associate with local counsel as provided in LCvR 83.3(a). Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 10/29/2019. (md)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Richard B. North, Jr terminated. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 10/29/2019. (md)
October 29, 2019 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Stephanie R Smiley on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Smiley, Stephanie)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Stephanie R. Smiley; granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Hiba Kazim. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 10/29/2019. (md)
October 28, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitution of Counsel by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Buchan, J)
October 28, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-3024689 by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Request for Admission)(Buchan, J)
October 28, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-3024687 by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Request for Admission)(Buchan, J)
October 28, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated . (Buchan, J)
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by C R Bard Incorporated . (Buchan, J)
October 24, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Micah J Petersen on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Petersen, Micah)
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by J Craig Buchan on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Buchan, J)
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 Civil Docket Sheet for District of Arizona Case: 2:15-md-02641-DGC (rb)
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-04220.
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 Suggestion of Remand and Transfer Order (second)from the District of Arizona: MDL 15-02641-PHX-DGC.(rb)
October 22, 2019 Remark: Case transferred to the Western District of Oklahoma via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/23/2019.]
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (SECOND). (See document for details). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 10/17/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/23/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-4220-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/23/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16986933 filed by Deberah Nightingale. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/23/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nightingale v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: J Craig Buchan
Represented By: Hiba Kazim
Represented By: Stephanie R Smiley
Represented By: Micah J Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: J Craig Buchan
Represented By: Hiba Kazim
Represented By: Stephanie R Smiley
Represented By: Micah J Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deberah Nightingale
Represented By: Jason Joseph Joy
Represented By: Thomas William Arbon
Represented By: Ben C Martin
Represented By: Laura J Baughman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?