Wyatt et al v. Davis H Elliot Company Inc
Plaintiff: Charlene Wyatt
Defendant: Davis H Elliot Company Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv00976
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Filing 9 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiffs Charlene Wyatt, Charlene Wyatt. (Finn, Larry)
November 18, 2019 Filing 8 STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 1/9/2020 10:15 AM in Chambers before Honorable Scott L. Palk. Status Report due by 1/2/2020. (md)
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Forrest L P DeVaughn on behalf of All Plaintiffs (DeVaughn, Forrest)
November 11, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Larry E Finn on behalf of Charlene Wyatt(Individually ), Charlene Wyatt(Administrator of the Estate of Dakota Doucet, Deceased) (Finn, Larry)
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Davis H Elliot Company Inc . (Cowan, J)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Davis H Elliot Company Inc.(Paruolo, Thomas)
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by J Derek Cowan on behalf of Davis H Elliot Company Inc (Cowan, J)
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Thomas A Paruolo on behalf of Davis H Elliot Company Inc (Paruolo, Thomas)
October 25, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3023159. (Paruolo, Thomas)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2019-5431 filed by Davis H Elliot Company Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 State Court Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 EOA of Finn State Court, #3 Exhibit 3 Aff of Service State Court, #4 Exhibit 4 State Court Docket Sheet, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(rb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wyatt et al v. Davis H Elliot Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlene Wyatt
Represented By: Forrest L P DeVaughn
Represented By: Larry E Finn
Represented By: Murry J Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davis H Elliot Company Inc
Represented By: Thomas A Paruolo
Represented By: J Derek Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?