Garden Ponds Unlimited LLC v. Oklahoma Ponds LLC
Plaintiff: Garden Ponds Unlimited LLC
Defendant: Oklahoma Ponds LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00983
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Stephen P Friot
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1121
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Filing 9 Report Regarding Patent and Trademark with Decision/Judgment. (ac)
November 19, 2019 Filing 8 ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING ORDER: This action is administratively terminated without prejudice to the rights of the parties to file any stipulation or dismissal, or to seek any order required to obtain a final determination of these proceedings based on the settlement. If parties have not filed any such document within 90 days for the purpose of dismissal pursuant to the settlement and compromise, this action shall be deemed dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 11/19/2019. (llg)
November 19, 2019 Filing 7 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Administrative Closure by Garden Ponds Unlimited LLC. (Cooper, Cody)
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Garden Ponds Unlimited LLC. Oklahoma Ponds LLC served on 10/30/2019. (Miller, Jennifer)
November 1, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Cody J Cooper on behalf of Garden Ponds Unlimited LLC (Cooper, Cody)
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Jennifer L Miller on behalf of Garden Ponds Unlimited LLC (Miller, Jennifer)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 Report Regarding Patent and Trademark (ac)
October 28, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3023896. (Miller, Jennifer)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Oklahoma Ponds LLC. (ac)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Oklahoma Ponds LLC filed by Garden Ponds Unlimited LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garden Ponds Unlimited LLC v. Oklahoma Ponds LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garden Ponds Unlimited LLC
Represented By: Cody J Cooper
Represented By: Jennifer L Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma Ponds LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?