Board of County Commissioners of Logan County v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Plaintiff: Board of County Commissioners of Logan County
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, CVS Health Corp, Mallinckrodt LLC, Amerisourcebergen Corp, Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, Watson Pharma Inc, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc, William Valuck, The Purdue Frederick Company, Physicians Total Care Inc, Allergan plc, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Actavis plc, McKesson Corp, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, Perry Fine, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Purdue Pharma Inc, Keysource Medical Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Harvey Jenkins, Insys Therapeutic Inc, Anda Inc, GCP Pharma LLC, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc, Cardinal Health Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Actavis LLC, Morris & Dickson Co LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Walgreen Co, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Lynn Webster, Watson Pharmaceutical Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc and Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Case Number: 5:2019cv00984
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Joe Heaton
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE (other) by Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc of Firm Name Change (Sparks, John)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #46 Asley E. Quinn, Esq.'s motion to withdraw as counsel for defendants...the clerk of court is directed to strike Ms. Quinn's name as counsel of record for defendants Anda, Inc., and Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 12/20/2019. (lam)
December 19, 2019 Filing 47 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, Watson Pharma Inc . (Evans, Kyle)
December 19, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Quinn, Ashley)
December 19, 2019 Filing 45 ENTRY of Appearance by Kyle D Evans on behalf of Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc (Evans, Kyle)
December 19, 2019 Filing 44 ENTRY of Appearance by Kyle D Evans on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, Watson Pharma Inc (Evans, Kyle)
December 19, 2019 Filing 43 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert G McCampbell on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, Watson Pharma Inc (McCampbell, Robert)
December 16, 2019 Filing 42 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ada Stay Order, #2 Exhibit Seminole Stay Order, #3 Exhibit Osage Stay Order, #4 Exhibit Pawnee Stay Order, #5 Exhibit Delaware Stay Order, #6 Exhibit Jenks Stay Order, #7 Exhibit JPML Dkt 6166, #8 Exhibit Wis Stay Order, #9 Exhibit Cal Stay Order, #10 Exhibit KY Stay Order, #11 Exhibit 6 Cty Transfer Order, #12 Exhibit 1 Cty Transfer Order, #13 Exhibit 7 Cty Transfer Order, #14 Exhibit 6 Cty Transfer Order, #15 Exhibit JPML 5422, #16 Exhibit Alameda Stay Order, #17 Exhibit Portland Stay Order, #18 Exhibit EDVA Stay Order, #19 Exhibit WDVA Stay Order, #20 Exhibit Cal Stay Order, #21 Exhibit Ill Stay Order, #22 Exhibit Fla Deferral Order)(Campbell, Stuart)
December 16, 2019 Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition re #32 MOTION to Remand filed by McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ohio Statement of Interest, #2 Exhibit Ohio Order on Kentucky's Mot to Remand)(Campbell, Stuart)
December 16, 2019 Filing 40 RESPONSE in Opposition re #33 MOTION to Expedite filed by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
December 16, 2019 Filing 39 RESPONSE in Opposition re #33 MOTION to Expedite filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
December 16, 2019 Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re #32 MOTION to Remand filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #34 defendants CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC and Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.'s unopposed motion for extension of deadline...the referenced defendants shall file their answers or other responsive pleadings to plaintiff's complaint not later than 45 days following the later of the final determination of any motion to remand or transfer this action to the MDL Panel. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 12/04/2019. (lam)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 defendants Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan plc, Allergan Finance, LLC Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc., and Insys Therapeutics, Inc.'s unopposed motion for extension of deadline...defendants shall file their answer or other responsive pleading to plaintiff's complaint not later than 45 days following the later of the final determination of any motion to remand or transfer this action to the MDL Panel. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 12/04/2019. (lam)
December 3, 2019 Filing 35 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
December 3, 2019 Filing 34 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move to Dismiss or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Petition Under Rule 12 by CVS Health Corp, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc. (Sharpe, G)
November 25, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION to Expedite by Board of County Commissioners of Logan County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Weber Cty. v. Purdue Pharma, L.P., #2 Exhibit 2 - Uintah Cty. v. Purdue Pharma, L.P., #3 Exhibit 3 - Town of Randolph v. Purdue Pharma L.P., #4 Exhibit 4 - Dinwiddie Cty, Va. v. Purdue Pharma, L.P., #5 Exhibit 5 - Illinois Public Risk Fund v. Purdue Pharma L.P.)(Court, Todd)
November 25, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Remand by Board of County Commissioners of Logan County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Trotter v. Smith et al., #2 Exhibit 2 - Adams v. Wyeth)(Court, Todd)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #29 defendants Anda Inc's and Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc's unopposed motion for extension of deadline...defendants shall file their answer or other responsive pleadings to plaintiff's complaint not later than 45 days following the later of the final determination of any motion to remand or transfer of this action to the MDL Panel. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 11/20/19. (lam)
November 19, 2019 Filing 30 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey A Curran on behalf of Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc (Curran, Jeffrey)
November 19, 2019 Filing 29 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Quinn, Ashley)
November 19, 2019 Filing 28 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Quinn, Ashley)
November 19, 2019 Filing 27 ENTRY of Appearance by Ashley E Quinn on behalf of Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc (Quinn, Ashley)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc., The Harvard Drug Group LLC, and McKesson Corp.'s unopposed motion for extension of deadline; the referenced defendants shall file their answer or other responsive pleading to plaintiff's complaint not later than 45 days following the later of the final determination of any motion to remand or transfer of this action to the MDL Panel. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 11/06/2019. (lam)
November 5, 2019 Filing 25 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #22 defendant Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s unopposed motion for extension of deadline...defendant shall file its answer or other responsive pleading to plaintiff's complaint not later than 45 days following the later of the final determination of any motion to remand or transfer of this action to the MDL Panel. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 11/04/2019. (lam)
November 4, 2019 Filing 23 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation . (Huntsman, Susan)
November 1, 2019 Filing 22 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Riddles, D)
November 1, 2019 Filing 21 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Riddles, D)
November 1, 2019 Filing 20 ENTRY of Appearance by D Todd Riddles on behalf of Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc (Riddles, D)
October 31, 2019 Filing 19 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Harvard Drug Group LLC The . (Ray, Ryan)
October 31, 2019 Filing 18 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Cardinal Health Inc . (Ray, Ryan)
October 31, 2019 Filing 17 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Harvard Drug Group LLC The (Ray, Ryan)
October 31, 2019 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health Inc (Ray, Ryan)
October 31, 2019 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc (identifying: Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Johnson & Johnson; Corporate Parent Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.). (Sparks, John)
October 31, 2019 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by John H Sparks on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc (Sparks, John)
October 31, 2019 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael W Ridgeway on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc (Ridgeway, Michael)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 defendant AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation's motion for leave to correct docket; the clerk of court is directed to show AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation as the defendant in place of AmerisourceBergen Corporation. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 10/30/2019. (lam)
October 30, 2019 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by D Michael McBride, III on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Corp (McBride, D)
October 30, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket to Reflect Substitution of Party by Amerisourcebergen Corp. (Huntsman, Susan)
October 30, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Susan E Huntsman on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Corp (Huntsman, Susan)
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by McKesson Corp . (Campbell, Stuart)
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Docket, #2 Exhibit Petition, #3 Exhibit Summonses, #4 Exhibit Entry, #5 Exhibit Motion, #6 Exhibit Notice, #7 Exhibit Motion, #8 Exhibit Entry, #9 Exhibit Entry, #10 Exhibit Entry, #11 Exhibit Entry, #12 Exhibit Motion, #13 Exhibit Order, #14 Exhibit Order, #15 Exhibit Order, #16 Exhibit Entry, #17 Exhibit Motion, #18 Exhibit Motion, #19 Exhibit Notice, #20 Exhibit Order, #21 Exhibit Authorities)(Campbell, Stuart)
October 29, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Stuart D Campbell on behalf of McKesson Corp (Campbell, Stuart)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 ENTER ORDER directing the parties to file their entries of appearance conforming to LCvR83.4 not later than 10/31/2019. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 10/29/2019. (lam)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Health Solutions Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Raymond E Zschiesche on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc (Zschiesche, Raymond)
October 28, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3024732. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Logan County District Court, case number CJ-2019-35 filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Service Documents, #2 Exhibit 2 State-Court Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit 3 Petition, #4 Exhibit 4 Summons - Purdue Pharma Inc, #5 Exhibit 5 Summons - Purdue Pharma LP, #6 Exhibit 6 Summons - Purdue Frederick Co, #7 Exhibit 7 Summons - Cephalon Inc, #8 Exhibit 8 Summons - Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD, #9 Exhibit 9 Summons - Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, #10 Exhibit 10 Summons - Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, #11 Exhibit 11 Summons - Johnson & Johnson, #12 Exhibit 12 Summons - Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, #13 Exhibit 13 Summons - Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, #14 Exhibit 14 Summons - Endo Health Solutions Inc, #15 Exhibit 15 Summons - Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, #16 Exhibit 16 Summons - Allergan PLC, #17 Exhibit 17 Summons - Actavis PLC, #18 Exhibit 18 Summons - Actavis Pharma Inc, #19 Exhibit 19 Summons - Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc, #20 Exhibit 20 Summons - Watson Pharma Inc, #21 Exhibit 21 Summons - Watson Laboratories Inc, #22 Exhibit 22 Summons - Actavis LLC, #23 Exhibit 23 Summons - Mallinckrodt PLC, #24 Exhibit 24 Summons - Mallinckrodt LLC, #25 Exhibit 25 Summons - Insys Therapeutics Inc, #26 Exhibit 26 Summons - McKesson Corporation, #27 Exhibit 27 Summons - Cardinal Health Inc, #28 Exhibit 28 Summons - AmerisourceBergen Corporation, #29 Exhibit 29 Summons - Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc, #30 Exhibit 30 Summons - Anda Inc, #31 Exhibit 31 Summons - GCP Pharma LLC, #32 Exhibit 32 Summons - Keysource Medical Inc, #33 Exhibit 33 Summons - Morris & Dickson Co LLC, #34 Exhibit 34 Summons - Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc, #35 Exhibit 35 Summons - Harvard Drug Group, #36 Exhibit 36 Summons - Physicians Total Care Inc, #37 Exhibit 37 Summons - Physicians Total Care Inc, #38 Exhibit 38 Summons - CVS Health Corporation, #39 Exhibit 39 Summons - CVS Pharmacy Inc, #40 Exhibit 40 Summons - Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC, #41 Exhibit 41 Summons - Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc aka Walgreen Co, #42 Exhibit 42 Summons - Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc aka Walgreen Co, #43 Exhibit 43 Summons - William Valuck MD, #44 Exhibit 44 Summons - Harvey Jenkins MD, #45 Exhibit 45 Summons - Perry Fine MD, #46 Exhibit 46 Summons - Lynn Webster MD, #47 Exhibit 47 Summons - Physicians Total Care Inc, #48 Exhibit 48 Entry of Appearance by Attorney for Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc, #49 Exhibit 49 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc, #50 Exhibit 50 Notice of Bankruptcy by Purdue Pharma, #51 Exhibit 51 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time by CVS et al, #52 Exhibit 52 Entry of Appearance by Attorney for Cardinal Health Inc, #53 Exhibit 53 Entry of Appearance by Attorney for Harvard Drug Group LLC, #54 Exhibit 54 Entry of Appearance by Attorney for McKesson Corporation, #55 Exhibit 55 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time by McKesson et al, #56 Exhibit 56 Entry of Appearance by Attorney for AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, #57 Exhibit 57 Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc, #58 Exhibit 58 Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time by McKesson et al, #59 Exhibit 59 Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time by CVS et al, #60 Exhibit 60 Entry of Appearance by Attorney for Anda, #61 Exhibit 61 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time by Anda, #62 Exhibit 62 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time by Endo, #63 Exhibit 63 Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time by Endo, #64 Exhibit 64 Notice of Federal Preliminary Injunction Order, #65 Civil Cover Sheet)(nv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of County Commissioners of Logan County v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc
Represented By: G Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma LP
Represented By: Joshua D Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corp
Represented By: G Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC
Represented By: G Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma Inc
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: D Todd Riddles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Valuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company
Represented By: Joshua D Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physicians Total Care Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc
Represented By: Raymond E Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corp
Represented By: Stuart D Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvard Drug Group LLC The
Represented By: Ryan A Ray
Represented By: Stuart D Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Fine
Represented By: Robert A Bragalone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Represented By: Joshua D Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keysource Medical Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvey Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutic Inc
Represented By: Amy J Pierce
Represented By: Joe M Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Inc
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Represented By: Jeffrey A Curran
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GCP Pharma LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Represented By: Jeffrey A Curran
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc
Represented By: Ryan A Ray
Represented By: Stuart D Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma Inc
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co
Represented By: G Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc
Represented By: G Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Webster
Represented By: Robert A Bragalone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceutical Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Raymond E Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Susan E Huntsman
Represented By: D Michael McBride, III
Represented By: Stuart D Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of County Commissioners of Logan County
Represented By: Todd A Court
Represented By: Tony G Puckett
Represented By: Matthew J Sill
Represented By: Harrison C Lujan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?