Bates-Bey v. State Capitol of Oklahoma et al
Plaintiff: Antone Bates-Bey and Qawi
Defendant: Oklahoma State of, State Capitol of Oklahoma and Oklahoma Registrar of Vital Statistics
Case Number: 5:2019cv00985
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Stephen P Friot
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. #13 "Affidavit of Fact Writ of Error" filed by Antone Bates-Bey, #14 "Affidavit of Financial Statement (Exercise of Constitution - Secured Right)" filed by Antone Bates-Bey and #15 "Affidavit of Fact Writ of Discovery" filed by Antone Bates-Bey, all construed as a motion to reconsider the court's 11/5/2019 order denying plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed on Appeal Without Prepayment of Costs or Fees, is DENIED. To the extent plaintiff is seeking any other relief with his affidavits, the relief is also DENIED. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 11/15/2019. (llg)
November 13, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE (other) titled Affidavit of Fact Writ of Discovery by Antone Bates-Bey (ac)
November 13, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE (other)titled Affidavit of Financial Statement by Antone Bates-Bey (ac)
November 13, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE (other) titled Affidavit of Fact Writ of Error by Antone Bates-Bey re #12 Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis (ac)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying #9 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 11/5/2019. (llg)
November 5, 2019 Filing 11 Tenth Circuit USCA Case Number 19-6165 for #8 Notice of Appeal filed by Antone Bates-Bey. Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 11/05/2019 Notice of appearance due on 12/05/2019 for Antone "Qawi" Bates-Bey. [19-6165] (ac)
November 5, 2019 Filing 10 PRELIMINARY RECORD LETTER - Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal with Preliminary Record sent to Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals re #8 Notice of Appeal (Attachments: #1 Attachment Prelim ROA)(ac)
November 4, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Antone Bates-Bey. (ac)
November 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #7 Judgment, #6 Order Dismissing Case by Antone Bates-Bey. (ac)
October 30, 2019 Filing 7 JUDGMENT. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 10/30/2019. (llg)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 10/30/2019. (llg)
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 Receipt for Money Received from Antone Bates-Bey in the amount of $400.00, receipt number OKW500076804 regarding #1 Complaint. (ank)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Oklahoma Registrar of Vital Statistics, Oklahoma State of, State Capitol of Oklahoma. (ank)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Order titled "Averment of Jurisdiction" by Antone Bates-Bey. (ank)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 Special Appearance by Antone Bates-Bey. (ank)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Oklahoma Registrar of Vital Statistics, State Capitol of Oklahoma filed by Antone Bates-Bey. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Affidavit of Truth, #2 Attachment 2 - Substance Abuse Evaluation, #3 Attachment 3 - Divine Constitution of Moorish America, #4 Attachment 4 - DOC Offender Lookup, #5 Attachment 5 - Certificate of Birth, #6 Attachment 6 - Universal Declaration of Human Rights, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(ank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bates-Bey v. State Capitol of Oklahoma et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antone Bates-Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Qawi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Capitol of Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma Registrar of Vital Statistics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?