Jackson v. Board of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County
Plaintiff: Oscar Rolondo Jackson
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County
Case Number: 5:2019cv00996
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Joe Heaton
Referring Judge: Bernard M Jones
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY by Plaintiff Oscar Rolondo Jackson re #12 Order. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ac)
December 20, 2019 Filing 13 Receipt for Money Received from Oscar Rolondo Jackson in the amount of $10.00, receipt number OKW500077737 regarding #1 Complaint. Remaining balance $340.00 (ac)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Plaintiff has filed a response to that Order in which he asks the Court to lower the payment. [Doc. No. 11]. The Court declines to do so. The $9.15 payment represents twenty percent of the greater of Plaintiff's (1) average monthly deposits, or (2) average monthly balance in Plaintiff's prison account (s) for the approximate six-month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint. This is the statutory standard. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b). Plaintiff's deadline remains December 24, 2019 to either make the partial filing fee payment or voluntarily dismiss the action in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) (without incurring any fees or costs). re #11 Response filed by Oscar Rolondo Jackson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones on 12/16/2019. (sr)
December 12, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE re #10 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Oscar Rolondo Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - ODOC Offender Transaction History, #2 Envelope)(nv)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ~ The Court finds Plaintiff is entitled to proceed without full prepayment of the filing fee, and his Application is granted. #9 However, Plaintiff shall be required to pay the full $350 filing fee as set forth. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that on or before December 24, 2019, Plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $9.15 which represents 20% of the greater of the (1) average monthly deposits, or (2) average monthly balance in Plaintiff's prison account(s) for the approximate 6 month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint. #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones on 12/3/2019. (dwl)
November 25, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Oscar Rolondo Jackson. Motions referred to Bernard M. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1-Note from Mr. Jackson, #2 Envelope)(nv)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ~ Granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File or seek leave to proceed in forma pauperis. His deadline is extended to December 26, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones on 11/22/2019. (dwl)
November 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time re [ 5] ORDER TO CURE DEFICIENCIES, by Oscar Rolondo Jackson. Motions referred to Bernard M. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Inmate Request, #2 Envelope) (nv).
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint, by Oscar Rolondo Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(nv)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO CURE DEFICIENCIES ~ Plaintiff shall either pay the full $400.00 filing fee or seek leave to proceed in forma pauperis on the proper form, no later than November 25, 2019. Failure to comply with this Order may result in the dismissal of this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones on 11/4/2019. (dwl)
October 30, 2019 Filing 4 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones. Motions referred to Bernard M. Jones.Entered at the direction of the Honorable Joe Heaton on 10/30/19. (rb)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 NO PREVIOUS Cases (rb)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Oscar Rolondo Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rb)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Board of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County filed by Oscar Rolondo Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1- Statement from Oscar Rolando Jackson, #2 Attachment 2- Sick Call request, #3 Attachment 3- Complaint of Violations, #4 Attachment 4- New Articles Labeled Supporting Evidence, #5 Envelope)(rb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Board of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Rolondo Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?