Huggard v. Sunbeam Products Inc et al
Plaintiff: Mary Huggard
Defendant: Sunbeam Products Inc and Sam's East Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv01010
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Robin J Cauthron
Referring Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Filing 21 JOINT STATUS REPORT & Discovery Plan by Plaintiff Mary Huggard. (Helms, Conner)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Robin J. Cauthron for all further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 12/20/2019. (md)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Honorable Scott L. Palk recused.. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 12/20/2019. (md)
December 16, 2019 Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by Greg S Keogh on behalf of Sunbeam Products Inc (Keogh, Greg)
December 12, 2019 NOTICE FROM THE COURT #17 Disclosure Statement - Corporate STRICKEN as this is not a Corporate Disclosure Statement. (rb)
December 11, 2019 Filing 17 STRICKEN DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Sunbeam Products Inc . (Carr, Eddie) Pursuant to Notice from the Court on 12/12/2019.
December 3, 2019 NOTICE FROM THE COURT #16 Disclosure Statement - Corporate STRICKEN as this is not a Corporate Disclosure Statement. (md)
December 3, 2019 Filing 16 STRICKEN DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Mary Huggard . (Helms, Conner) Pursuant to Notice from the Court on 12/3/2019 (md).
November 18, 2019 Filing 15 STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 1/9/2020 10:30 AM in Chambers before Honorable Scott L. Palk. Status Report due by 1/2/2020. (md)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Defendant, Sunbeam Products, Inc. Attorney Jeff C Grotta and Cary E Hiltgen terminated. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 11/14/2019. (md)
November 13, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Sunbeam Products, Inc. by Sunbeam Products Inc. (Grotta, Jeff)
November 11, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Sam's East Inc.(Grotta, Jeff)
November 8, 2019 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Eddie L Carr on behalf of Sunbeam Products Inc (Carr, Eddie)
November 8, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Sunbeam Products Inc.(Carr, Eddie)
November 5, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3029806. (Hiltgen, Cary)
November 4, 2019 Filing 9 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Sunbeam Products Inc. (Grotta, Jeff)
November 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE (other) by Sam's East Inc re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent to Notice of Removal (Grotta, Jeff)
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Sam's East Inc . (Grotta, Jeff)
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Sunbeam Products Inc . (Grotta, Jeff)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeff C Grotta on behalf of Sam's East Inc (Grotta, Jeff)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeff C Grotta on behalf of Sunbeam Products Inc (Grotta, Jeff)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Cary E Hiltgen on behalf of Sam's East Inc (Hiltgen, Cary)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Cary E Hiltgen on behalf of Sunbeam Products Inc (Hiltgen, Cary)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2019-5730 filed by Sunbeam Products Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Oklahoma County Docket Sheet - CJ-2019-5730, #2 Exhibit 2-Plaintiff's Petition, #3 Exhibit 3-Summons, #4 Exhibit 4- 4 - Notice to State Court of Removal to Federal Court, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(rb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huggard v. Sunbeam Products Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Huggard
Represented By: Conner L Helms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunbeam Products Inc
Represented By: Cary E Hiltgen
Represented By: Jeff C Grotta
Represented By: Greg S Keogh
Represented By: Eddie L Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam's East Inc
Represented By: Cary E Hiltgen
Represented By: Jeff C Grotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?