Cox et al v. Golden Transit Inc et al
Plaintiff: Brion Roberts Ragland, Richard Douglas Cox, Deann Lorraine Ragland, Greta Cox and Robert Cox
Defendant: Amarjit Singh Khaira and Golden Transit Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv01049
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: David L Russell
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Katie R McCune on behalf of All Defendants (McCune, Katie)
December 30, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by All Defendants.(Bowers, Brock)
December 30, 2019 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Brock C Bowers on behalf of All Defendants (Bowers, Brock)
November 25, 2019 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Morris J Chavez on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Chavez, Morris)
November 25, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Christopher T Saucedo on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Saucedo, Christopher)
November 19, 2019 Filing 9 Receipt for Money Received in the amount of $50.00, receipt number OKW500077256 regarding #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Saucedo (kmt)
November 19, 2019 Filing 8 Receipt for Money Received in the amount of $50.00, receipt number OKW500077255 regarding #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Chavez (kmt)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Christopher T. Saucedo; granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Morris J. Chavez. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 11/19/19. (jw)
November 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Chavez by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Req. for Admission PHV)(Neville, Patrick)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Saucedo by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Req. for Admission PHV)(Neville, Patrick)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by David Alan Cheek on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Cheek, David)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Patrick L Neville, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Neville, Patrick)
November 14, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3035989. (Cheek, David)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Golden Transit Inc, Amarjit Singh Khaira. (nv)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Golden Transit Inc, Amarjit Singh Khaira filed by Robert Cox, Greta Cox, Richard Douglas Cox, Deann Lorraine Ragland, Brion Roberts Ragland. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox et al v. Golden Transit Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brion Roberts Ragland
Represented By: Patrick L Neville, Jr
Represented By: David Alan Cheek
Represented By: Morris J Chavez
Represented By: Christopher T Saucedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Douglas Cox
Represented By: Patrick L Neville, Jr
Represented By: David Alan Cheek
Represented By: Morris J Chavez
Represented By: Christopher T Saucedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deann Lorraine Ragland
Represented By: Patrick L Neville, Jr
Represented By: David Alan Cheek
Represented By: Morris J Chavez
Represented By: Christopher T Saucedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greta Cox
Represented By: Patrick L Neville, Jr
Represented By: David Alan Cheek
Represented By: Morris J Chavez
Represented By: Christopher T Saucedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Cox
Represented By: Patrick L Neville, Jr
Represented By: David Alan Cheek
Represented By: Morris J Chavez
Represented By: Christopher T Saucedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amarjit Singh Khaira
Represented By: Katie R McCune
Represented By: Brock C Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Transit Inc
Represented By: Katie R McCune
Represented By: Brock C Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?