Kraft v. Barnhart
Plaintiff: Levi Edgar Kraft
Defendant: Kenneth Barnhart
Case Number: 5:2019cv01079
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Charles Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 8 ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING ORDER: This action is administratively terminated without prejudice to the rights of the parties to reopen for entry of any stipulation or order. If not reopened within 30 days to obtain final determination, action is deemed dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 01/17/2020. (jb)
January 15, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Settlement by Levi Edgar Kraft (Branum, John)
December 11, 2019 Filing 6 DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 2/5/2020 10:00 AM in Room 3108 before Honorable Charles Goodwin. Status Report due by 1/29/2020. (jb)
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Kenneth Barnhart.(Roberson, Brad)
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE (other) by Kenneth Barnhart re #1 Notice of Removal, (Roberson, Brad)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Lauren N Watson on behalf of Kenneth Barnhart (Watson, Lauren)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Brad L Roberson on behalf of Kenneth Barnhart (Roberson, Brad)
November 21, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3040715. (Roberson, Brad)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Payne County, case number CJ-2019-490 filed by Kenneth Barnhart. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons Issued to Def, #4 Exhibit 4 - Police Report_Redacted, #5 Exhibit 5 - Defendant's DL, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(ank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kraft v. Barnhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Barnhart
Represented By: Lauren N Watson
Represented By: Brad L Roberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levi Edgar Kraft
Represented By: Jay M Mitchel
Represented By: John L Branum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?