Lincoln County Board of County Commissioners v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Plaintiff: Lincoln County Board of County Commissioners
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, Mallinckrodt LLC, Keysource Medical Inc, Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, Watson Pharma Inc, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc, The Purdue Frederick Company, Physicians Total Care Inc, Allergan plc, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Saj Distributors, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, McKesson Corp, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, Actavis plc, CVS Pharmacy, HD Smith Wholesale Drug Co, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Purdue Pharma Inc, CVS Health Corporation, Watson Laboratories Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Anda Inc, GCP Pharma LLC, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc, Cardinal Health Inc, Actavis LLC, Morris & Dickson Co LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp, Walgreen Co and Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv01109
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition re #30 MOTION to Remand filed by McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - OH Statement of Interest, #2 Exhibit 2 - OH Order on Mtn to Remand)(Campbell, Stuart)
January 10, 2020 Filing 40 RESPONSE in Opposition re #31 MOTION to Expedite filed by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, HD Smith Wholesale Drug Co, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
January 10, 2020 Filing 39 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, HD Smith Wholesale Drug Co, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Ada Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Seminole Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - Osage Order, #4 Exhibit 4 - Pawnee Order, #5 Exhibit 5 - Delaware Order, #6 Exhibit 6 - Order granting Motion to Stay, #7 Exhibit 7 - JPML 6437, #8 Exhibit 8 - Wis Order, #9 Exhibit 9 - Cal Order, #10 Exhibit 10 - KY Order, #11 Exhibit 11 - 6 Cty Transfer Order, #12 Exhibit 12 - 1 Cty Transfer Order, #13 Exhibit 13 - 7 Cty Transfer Order, #14 Exhibit 14 - 6 Cty Transfer Order, #15 Exhibit 15 - JPML 5422, #16 Exhibit 16 - JPML 5737, #17 Exhibit 17 - JPML 6100, #18 Exhibit 18 - JPML 6538, #19 Exhibit 19 - Alameda Order, #20 Exhibit 20 - Portland Order, #21 Exhibit 21 - EDVA Order, #22 Exhibit 22 - WDVA Order, #23 Exhibit 23 - Cal Order, #24 Exhibit 24 - Ill Order, #25 Exhibit 25 - Fla Deferral Order)(Campbell, Stuart) (Main Document 39 replaced on 1/10/2020 per counsel request to reflect correct case number)(rb).
January 10, 2020 Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re #30 MOTION to Remand filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
January 10, 2020 Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re #31 MOTION to Expedite filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #33 , #34 and #35 unopposed motions (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 1/6/2020. (ks)
January 3, 2020 Filing 35 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,,, by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
January 3, 2020 Filing 34 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,,, by Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-District Court Extension)(Evans, Kyle)
December 31, 2019 Filing 33 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move to Dismiss or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Petition Under Rule 12 by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc. (White, Amy)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #27 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ashley E Quinn terminated. Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 12/23/2019. (ks)
December 20, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION to Expedite by Lincoln County Board of County Commissioners. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Weber Cty. v. Purdue Pharma, L.P., #2 Exhibit 2 - Uintah Cty. v. Purdue Pharma, L.P., #3 Exhibit 3 - Town of Randolph v. Purdue Pharma L.P., #4 Exhibit 4 - Dinwiddie Cty, Va. v. Purdue Pharma, L.P., #5 Exhibit 5 - Illinois Public Risk Fund v. Purdue Pharma L.P.)(Court, Todd)
December 20, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION to Remand by Lincoln County Board of County Commissioners. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Trotter v. Smith et al., #2 Exhibit 2 - Adams v. Wyeth)(Court, Todd)
December 19, 2019 Filing 29 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Evans, Kyle)
December 19, 2019 Filing 28 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, Watson Pharma Inc . (Evans, Kyle)
December 19, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Quinn, Ashley)
December 19, 2019 Filing 26 ENTRY of Appearance by Kyle D Evans on behalf of Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc (Evans, Kyle)
December 19, 2019 Filing 25 ENTRY of Appearance by Kyle D Evans on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, Watson Pharma Inc (Evans, Kyle)
December 19, 2019 Filing 24 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert G McCampbell on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, Watson Pharma Inc (McCampbell, Robert)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Defendant Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 12/11/2019. (ks)
December 10, 2019 Filing 22 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Riddles, D)
December 10, 2019 Filing 21 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Riddles, D)
December 10, 2019 Filing 20 ENTRY of Appearance by D Todd Riddles on behalf of Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc (Riddles, D)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Defendants McKesson Corporation; Cardinal Health, Inc.; The Harvard Drug Group, LLC; AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation; and H.D. Smith, LLC f/k/a H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company's Unopposed Joint Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 12/4/2019. (ks)
December 3, 2019 Filing 18 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, HD Smith Wholesale Drug Co, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
November 27, 2019 Filing 17 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Health Solutions Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond)
November 27, 2019 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond)
November 27, 2019 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Raymond E Zschiesche on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc (Zschiesche, Raymond)
November 27, 2019 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by D Michael McBride, III on behalf of HD Smith Wholesale Drug Co (McBride, D)
November 27, 2019 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by D Michael McBride, III on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp (McBride, D)
November 27, 2019 Filing 12 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,,, Supplemental Notice in Support of Removal by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Service Documents)(Zschiesche, Raymond)
November 27, 2019 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by HD Smith Wholesale Drug Co . (Huntsman, Susan)
November 27, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Susan E Huntsman on behalf of HD Smith Wholesale Drug Co (Huntsman, Susan)
November 27, 2019 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp . (Huntsman, Susan)
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Susan E Huntsman on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp (Huntsman, Susan)
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Harvard Drug Group LLC The . (Ray, Ryan)
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Harvard Drug Group LLC The (Ray, Ryan)
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Cardinal Health Inc . (Ray, Ryan)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health Inc (Ray, Ryan)
November 26, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3044436. (Campbell, Stuart)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by McKesson Corp . (Campbell, Stuart)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Stuart D Campbell on behalf of McKesson Corp (Campbell, Stuart)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Lincoln County, case number CJ-2019-89 filed by McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 001 - Docket, #2 Exhibit 002 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 003 - Return of Service- Physicians Total Care, #4 Exhibit 004 - Return of Servcie-CVS Pharmacy Inc, #5 Exhibit 005 - Return of Service-Acatavis LLC, #6 Exhibit 006 - Return of Service-Actavis Pharma Inc, #7 Exhibit 007 - Return of Service-Anda Inc, #8 Exhibit 008 - Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc, #9 Exhibit 009 - Return of Service-Cephalon Inc, #10 Exhibit 010 - Return of Service-Distributors, #11 Exhibit 011 - Return of Service-H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co, #12 Exhibit 012 - Return of Service-Keysource Medical, #13 Exhibit 013 - Return of Service-Mallinckrodt LLC, #14 Exhibit 014 - Return of Service-Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, #15 Exhibit 015 - Return of Service-Walgreens Boot Alliance, #16 Exhibit 016 - Return of Service-Watson Laboratories Inc, #17 Exhibit 017 - Entry of Appearance (Amerisourcebergen), #18 Exhibit 018 - Entry of Appearance (McKesson), #19 Exhibit 019 - Entry of Appearance (Quest), #20 Exhibit 020 - Return of Service (Physicians Total), #21 Exhibit 021 - Return of Service (Purdue Pharma), #22 Exhibit 022 - Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Answer (McKesson), #23 Exhibit 023 - Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Answer (Quest), #24 Exhibit 024 - Return of Service (Cardinal), #25 Exhibit 025 - Return of Service (J&J), #26 Exhibit 026 - Return of Service (Janssen Pharma), #27 Exhibit 027 - Return of Service (Janssen), #28 Exhibit 028 - Return of Service (Mallinckrodt), #29 Exhibit 029 - Return of Service (Morris & Dickson), #30 Exhibit 030 - Return of Service (Ortho McNeil), #31 Exhibit 031 - Return of Service (Purdue Frederick), #32 Exhibit 032 - Return of Service (Purdue Pharma Inc), #33 Exhibit 033 - Return of Service (Quest), #34 Exhibit 034 - Return of Service (SAJ), #35 Exhibit 035 - Return of Service (Walgreens Boots), #36 Exhibit 036 - Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Answer (CVS-Walgreens), #37 Exhibit 037 - Entry of Appearance (H.D. Smith), #38 Exhibit 038 - Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Answer (H.D. Smith), #39 Exhibit 039 - Order Granting Motion (McKesson), #40 Exhibit 040 - Appearance (Anda), #41 Exhibit 041 - Motion for Enlargement (Anda), #42 Exhibit 042 - Motion for Extension (Endo), #43 Exhibit 043 - Order Granting Motion (CVS), #44 Exhibit 044 - Order Granting Motion (HD Smith), #45 Exhibit 045 - Order Granting Motion (Quest), #46 Exhibit 046 - Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time (McKesson), #47 Exhibit 047 - Order Granting Motion (Anda), #48 Exhibit 048 - Order Granting Motion (Endo), #49 Exhibit 049 - Entry of Appearance (Cardinal), #50 Exhibit 050 - Entry of Appearance (Harvard Drug Group), #51 Exhibit 051 - LCvR7.1, #52 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lincoln County Board of County Commissioners v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc
Represented By: Don W Danz
Represented By: Steven E Holden
Represented By: Amy D White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Jon Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keysource Medical Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC
Represented By: Amy D White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma Inc
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: D Todd Riddles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physicians Total Care Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc
Represented By: Raymond E Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saj Distributors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corp
Represented By: Kaylee P Davis-Maddy
Represented By: Stuart D Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvard Drug Group LLC The
Represented By: Ryan A Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy
Represented By: Amy D White
Represented By: G Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HD Smith Wholesale Drug Co
Represented By: D Michael McBride, III
Represented By: Susan E Huntsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Amy D White
Represented By: G Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Raymond E Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Inc
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Represented By: Jeffrey A Curran
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GCP Pharma LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Represented By: Jeffrey A Curran
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc
Represented By: Ryan A Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma Inc
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp
Represented By: D Michael McBride, III
Represented By: Susan E Huntsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co
Represented By: Don W Danz
Represented By: Steven E Holden
Represented By: Amy D White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lincoln County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: Todd A Court
Represented By: Matthew J Sill
Represented By: George Gibbs
Represented By: Harrison C Lujan
Represented By: Tony G Puckett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?