Couch v. Heartland Express Inc et al
Plaintiff: Michael Don Couch
Defendant: Heartland Express Inc and Bruce Pond
Case Number: 5:2019cv01117
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2020 Filing 17 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Defendants Heartland Express Inc, Bruce Pond. (Cowan, J)
January 29, 2020 Filing 16 STRICKEN MOTION to Amend/Correct by All Plaintiffs. (Coury, John). This document is sticken as it is not a Motion; further, the operative pleading as previously stated is the Amended Complaint #13 .(md).
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting #14 Motion to Amend/Correct as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 1/29/20. (md)
January 28, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Amend/Correct by All Plaintiffs. (Coury, John)
January 27, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Michael Don Couch.(Coury, John)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #11 FIRST MOTION to Amend/Correct complaint filed by Michael Don Couch. Plaintiff shall file an amended motion within seven days of this Order clarifying Defendants position regarding Plaintiffs amendmentrequest as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 1/23/20. (md)
January 22, 2020 Filing 11 FIRST MOTION to Amend/Correct complaint by Michael Don Couch. (Coury, John)
January 8, 2020 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by John D Coury on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Coury, John)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #8 Notice (other) filed by Michael Don Couch is STRICKEN without prejudice to Plaintiff altering the claims he asserts against Heartland Express via a different procedural mechanism. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 12/20/2019. (md)
December 19, 2019 Filing 8 STRICKEN NOTICE (other) by All Plaintiffs Partial Dismissal of Counts (Coury, John) Pursuant to Order #9 (md).
December 17, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Heartland Express Inc . (Cowan, J)
December 17, 2019 Filing 6 STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 2/6/2020 11:15 AM in Chambers before Honorable Scott L. Palk. Status Report due by 1/30/2020. (md)
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Derrick T DeWitt on behalf of All Defendants (DeWitt, Derrick)
December 9, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Bruce Pond.(Cowan, J)
December 9, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Heartland Express Inc.(Cowan, J)
December 9, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by J Derek Cowan on behalf of All Defendants (Cowan, J)
December 2, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3046026. (Cowan, J)
December 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2018-3239 filed by Heartland Express Inc, Bruce Pond. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2018-06-13 Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - 2019-07-18 Affidavit of Service of Def Pond, #3 Exhibit 3 - 2019-11-20 Certificate of Service upon Heartland, #4 Exhibit 4 - State Docket Sheet, #5 Exhibit 5 - 2018-08-01 Answer of Defendant Bruce Pond, #6 Exhibit 6 - 2018-10-09 EOA - DTD & JDC, #7 Exhibit 7 - 2018-11-09 Def Pond Motion to Compel, #8 Exhibit 8 - 2019-01-17 Def. Pond's Reply in Supp of MTC Plf.'s Resp. to Written Disc Req, #9 Exhibit 9 - 2019-01-24 EOA of LGG, #10 Exhibit 10 - 2019-01-24 Order re Def's MTC, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(rb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Couch v. Heartland Express Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Don Couch
Represented By: John D Coury
Represented By: Robert W Haiges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heartland Express Inc
Represented By: Derrick T DeWitt
Represented By: J Derek Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Pond
Represented By: Derrick T DeWitt
Represented By: J Derek Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?