Hood et al v. Singh et al
Plaintiff: Nichole R Hood, Kirstan Bennett, Kylie Bennett and Brandon Bennett
Defendant: EK Carriers Inc and Angrej Singh
Case Number: 5:2019cv01159
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: David L Russell
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2020 Docket Annotation: Case transferred from Oklahoma Western has been opened in Eastern District of Oklahoma as case 6:20-cv-00016, filed 01/14/2020. (kmt)
January 13, 2020 Docket Annotation: Case sent to the Eastern District of Oklahoma. (kmt)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER; re #3 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by EK Carriers Inc. Accordingly, Defendant requests that the Court transfer the case to the Eastern District, where venue is proper. Plaintiff does not object,this case to be transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 1/13/20. (jw)
January 9, 2020 Filing 8 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #4 Order for Response, to Defendants' Motion to Transfer by All Plaintiffs. (Cain, Monty)
January 3, 2020 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Monty L Cain on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Cain, Monty)
January 2, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants.(Folluo, Dan)
December 31, 2019 Filing 5 Receipt for Money Received from Angrej Singh in the amount of $400.00, receipt number OKW500077873 regarding #1 Notice of Removal,, (kmt)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Response re #3 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by EK Carriers Inc. Upon review, the Court orders Plaintiff to respond to Defendants transfer request by January 9, 2020. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 12/30/19. (jw)
December 17, 2019 Filing 3 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by EK Carriers Inc. (Clark, Eric)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ; Defendant is hereby ordered to show cause for their removal within seven days of the date of this order and to demonstrate whether the action should be remanded to the District Court of Carter County, Oklahoma or transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 12/16/19. (jw)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Carter County District Court, case number CJ-2019-158 filed by EK Carriers Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-State Court Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2-Petition, #3 Exhibit 3-EOA J. Foshee & C. Foshee, #4 Exhibit 4-Amended Notice of Publication, #5 Exhibit 5-Affidavit for Service by Publication, #6 Exhibit 6-Summons Issued to Removing Defendant, #7 Exhibit 7-Summons Issued to Defendant Singh, #8 Exhibit 8-Notice of Filing Removal to Federal Court, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(nv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hood et al v. Singh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nichole R Hood
Represented By: Jerry W Foshee
Represented By: Christopher W Foshee
Represented By: Monty L Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirstan Bennett
Represented By: Jerry W Foshee
Represented By: Christopher W Foshee
Represented By: Monty L Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kylie Bennett
Represented By: Jerry W Foshee
Represented By: Christopher W Foshee
Represented By: Monty L Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Bennett
Represented By: Jerry W Foshee
Represented By: Christopher W Foshee
Represented By: Monty L Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EK Carriers Inc
Represented By: Eric L Clark
Represented By: Dan S Folluo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angrej Singh
Represented By: Eric L Clark
Represented By: Dan S Folluo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?