Tollett v. Young
Plaintiff: Ashlee Tollett
Defendant: Gary Young
Case Number: 5:2019cv01170
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Referring Judge: Jodi W Dishman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiff shall file her response to Defendant Gary Young's Motion to Dismiss on or before March 3, 2020. Signed by Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 02/14/2020. (nv)
February 14, 2020 Filing 19 ENTRY of Appearance by Patricia A Podolec on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Podolec, Patricia)
February 14, 2020 Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by Kindra N Dotson-Avila on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Dotson-Avila, Kindra)
February 14, 2020 Filing 17 AMENDED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by All Plaintiffs. (Bussett, Rachel)
February 14, 2020 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Rachel L Bussett on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bussett, Rachel)
February 14, 2020 NOTICE from the Court #13 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support , #14 Entry of Appearance, #12 Entry of Appearance, #15 Entry of Appearance, STRICKEN due to counsel's failure to comply with Doc. No. #4 Order Reassigning Case, which requires proper case initials to ensure prompt distribution of filings to the proper judge. Counsel to refile. (nv)
February 14, 2020 Filing 15 STRICKEN ENTRY of Appearance by Patricia A Podolec on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Podolec, Patricia)
February 14, 2020 Filing 14 STRICKEN ENTRY of Appearance by Kindra N Dotson-Avila on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Dotson-Avila, Kindra)
February 14, 2020 Filing 13 STRICKEN UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by All Plaintiffs. (Bussett, Rachel)
February 14, 2020 Filing 12 STRICKEN ENTRY of Appearance by Rachel L Bussett on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bussett, Rachel)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael M Blue and Cameron M Spradling terminated. Signed by Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 02/12/2020. (nv)
February 11, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Ashlee Tollett. (Spradling, Cameron)
February 2, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE FROM THE COURT. Available on the website for the United States District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma, under "Rules & Procedures, Chambers Rules," are the following that are applicable in civil cases in front of Judge Dishman: (1) Chamber Procedures for Civil Cases (issued 1-28-2020) and (2) Civil Cases: Guidelines for Protective Orders on Confidentiality, Sealing Documents, and Redactions (issued 1-29-2020). Parties are expected to comply with these rules for all filings and proceedings going forward. The Court intends to strike filings that fail to comply with these rules. (nv)
January 27, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Gary Young. (Cain, Timothy)
January 27, 2020 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Timothy D Cain on behalf of Gary Young (Cain, Timothy)
January 9, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ashlee Tollett as to Gary Young. (Spradling, Cameron)
January 2, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Gary Young. (em)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Jodi W. Dishman for all further proceedings. Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti no longer assigned to case. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 12/26/2019. (mb)
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael M Blue on behalf of Ashlee Tollett (Blue, Michael)
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Cameron M Spradling on behalf of Ashlee Tollett (Spradling, Cameron)
December 19, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3058827. (Spradling, Cameron)
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gary Young filed by Ashlee Tollett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Application filed by the Oklahoma State Board of Education, #2 Exhibit 2-Criminal Affidavit filed 12-18-2019, #3 Exhibit 3-Criminal Information filed 12-18-2019, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tollett v. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashlee Tollett
Represented By: Cameron M Spradling
Represented By: Michael M Blue
Represented By: Rachel L Bussett
Represented By: Kindra N Dotson-Avila
Represented By: Patricia A Podolec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Young
Represented By: Timothy D Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?