Jager Pro LLC v. WW Livestock Corp et al
Plaintiff: Jager Pro LLC
Defendant: W-W Manufacturing Co Inc and WW Livestock Corp
Case Number: 5:2019cv01180
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Referring Judge: Bernard Jones
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jager Pro LLC (Miller, Richard)
January 29, 2020 Filing 22 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by W-W Manufacturing Co Inc . (Oubre, Zachary)
January 27, 2020 Filing 21 ENTRY of Appearance by Timothy J Carroll on behalf of W-W Manufacturing Co Inc, WW Livestock Corp (Carroll, Timothy)
January 27, 2020 Filing 20 ENTRY of Appearance by Catherine N Taylor on behalf of W-W Manufacturing Co Inc, WW Livestock Corp (Taylor, Catherine)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ~ The Court therefore ORDERS all parties to file their disclosure statements in compliance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, within seven days of this Order. Signed by Honorable Bernard Jones on 1/22/2020. (dwl)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ~ Granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall file their answer or other response to the Complaint on or before March 9, 2020. Signed by Honorable Bernard Jones on 1/22/2020. (dwl)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ~ Granting #15 and #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Timothy J. Carroll and Catherine N. Taylor are hereby admitted to practice before this Court for the limited purpose of participating in this case, provided each counsel submits an ECF registration form and files an entry of appearance. Signed by Honorable Bernard Jones on 1/22/2020. (dwl)
January 21, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Catherine N. Taylor Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-3079102 by W-W Manufacturing Co Inc, WW Livestock Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Request for PHV - Taylor)(Oubre, Zachary)
January 21, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Timothy J. Carroll Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-3079088 by W-W Manufacturing Co Inc, WW Livestock Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Request for PHV - Carroll)(Oubre, Zachary)
January 21, 2020 Filing 14 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by W-W Manufacturing Co Inc, WW Livestock Corp. (Oubre, Zachary)
January 21, 2020 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael J LaBrie on behalf of W-W Manufacturing Co Inc, WW Livestock Corp (LaBrie, Michael)
January 21, 2020 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Zachary A P Oubre on behalf of W-W Manufacturing Co Inc, WW Livestock Corp (Oubre, Zachary)
January 7, 2020 Filing 11 ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Bernard Jones for all further proceedings. Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti no longer assigned to case. Signed by the direction of Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 1/7/2020. (kmt)
December 30, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Richard William Miller on behalf of Jager Pro LLC (Miller, Richard)
December 30, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by D Alan White on behalf of Jager Pro LLC (White, D)
December 27, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued Electronically as to W-W Manufacturing Co Inc, WW Livestock Corp. (kmt)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Richard W. Miller. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 12/26/2019. (mb)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of D. Alan White. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 12/26/2019. (mb)
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Richard W. Miller Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-3061181 by Jager Pro LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Richard W. Miller Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Nelon, Robert)
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of D. Alan White Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-3061179 by Jager Pro LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D. Alan White Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Nelon, Robert)
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 Report Regarding Patent and Trademark (kmt)
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert D Nelon on behalf of Jager Pro LLC (Nelon, Robert)
December 23, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3061135. (Nelon, Robert)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against W-W Manufacturing Co Inc, WW Livestock Corp filed by Jager Pro LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - BoarBuster US9814228, #2 Exhibit 2 - BoarBuster US10098339, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jager Pro LLC v. WW Livestock Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jager Pro LLC
Represented By: Robert D Nelon
Represented By: Richard William Miller
Represented By: D Alan White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W-W Manufacturing Co Inc
Represented By: Michael J LaBrie
Represented By: Timothy J Carroll
Represented By: Catherine N Taylor
Represented By: Zachary A P Oubre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WW Livestock Corp
Represented By: Michael J LaBrie
Represented By: Timothy J Carroll
Represented By: Catherine N Taylor
Represented By: Zachary A P Oubre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?