Miller et al v. C. R. Bard, Inc.
Plaintiff: Veronica Miller and Timothy D. Miller
Defendant: Sofradim Production SAS and C. R. Bard, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv01200
Filed: December 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: David L Russell
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Filing 47 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:13-cv-19300.
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 TRANSFER ORDER directing that on 12/30/2019 this case shall be transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma; on or before 12/29/2019 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract this case and transfer it to the United States District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma; after transfer of this case, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 12/16/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/2/2020.]
December 16, 2019 Filing 45 REPLY by C. R. Bard, Inc. in support of #42 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. to Exclude The Opinions and Testimony of Matthew Karlovsky, M.D., F.A.C.S. (Woo, Maryanne) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/2/2020.]
December 9, 2019 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM OF LAW for RESPONSE by Timothy D. Miller, Veronica Miller in opposition to #42 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. to Exclude The Opinions and Testimony of Matthew Karlovsky, M.D., F.A.C.S. (Oliver, Alyson) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/2/2020.]
November 25, 2019 Filing 43 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by C. R. Bard, Inc. in support of #42 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. to Exclude The Opinions and Testimony of Matthew Karlovsky, M.D., F.A.C.S. (Woo, Maryanne) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/2/2020.]
November 25, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. to Exclude The Opinions and Testimony of Matthew Karlovsky, M.D., F.A.C.S. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Woo, Maryanne) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/2/2020.]
November 22, 2019 Filing 41 REPLY by C. R. Bard, Inc. to #37 Brief In Opposition. (Woo, Maryanne) (Modified on 11/23/2019 to remove link to #32 motion)(mk). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/2/2020.]
November 22, 2019 Filing 40 REPLY by Timothy D. Miller, Veronica Miller to #39 Response In Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Oliver, Alyson) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/2/2020.]
November 21, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #39 OPPOSITION by C. R. Bard, Inc. in to #34 MOTION by Timothy D. Miller, Veronica Miller to Exclude Case Specific and General Opinions and Testimony of Thomas Giudice, M.D., M.S. ERROR: Incorrect image of Exhibit A attached. CORRECTION: Removed and replaced incorrect image. (slr) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/2/2020.]
November 18, 2019 Filing 39 OPPOSITION by C. R. Bard, Inc. in to #34 MOTION by Timothy D. Miller, Veronica Miller to Exclude Case Specific and General Opinions and Testimony of Thomas Giudice, M.D., M.S. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Woo, Maryanne) (Modified on 11/21/2019 to remove and replace Exhibit A)(slr). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/2/2020.]
November 15, 2019 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM of Law by Veronica Miller for Response in opposition to #32 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Oliver, Alyson) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/2/2020.]
November 15, 2019 Filing 37 BRIEF by Timothy D. Miller, Veronica Miller in opposition to #32 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. for Summary Judgment (Oliver, Alyson) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/2/2020.]
November 5, 2019 Filing 36 AMENDED MEMORANDUM by Timothy D. Miller, Veronica Miller in support of #34 MOTION by Timothy D. Miller, Veronica Miller to Exclude Case Specific and General Opinions and Testimony of Thomas Giudice, M.D., M.S. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Oliver, Alyson) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/2/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM by Timothy D. Miller, Veronica Miller in support of #34 MOTION by Timothy D. Miller, Veronica Miller to Exclude Case Specific and General Opinions and Testimony of Thomas Giudice, M.D., M.S. (Oliver, Alyson) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/2/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION by Timothy D. Miller, Veronica Miller to Exclude Case Specific and General Opinions and Testimony of Thomas Giudice, M.D., M.S.(Oliver, Alyson) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/2/2020.]
November 1, 2019 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by C. R. Bard, Inc. in support of #32 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment (Woo, Maryanne) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/2/2020.]
November 1, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Woo, Maryanne) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/2/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #28 JOINT MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc., Veronica Miller, Timothy D. Miller to Extend the Deposition and Daubert Motion Deadlines Regarding Plaintiffs' Case Specific Expert to 11/25/2019. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/23/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/2/2020.]
October 18, 2019 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Timothy D. Miller, Veronica Miller for Notice of Video Deposition of Dr. Thomas Giudice, Duces Tecum. (Oliver, Alyson) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/2/2020.]
October 18, 2019 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by C. R. Bard, Inc. in support of #28 JOINT MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc., Veronica Miller, Timothy D. Miller to Extend the Deposition and Daubert Motion Deadlines Regarding Plaintiffs' Case Specific Expert to 11/25/2019 (Woo, Maryanne) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/2/2020.]
October 18, 2019 Filing 28 JOINT MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc., Veronica Miller, Timothy D. Miller to Extend the Deposition and Daubert Motion Deadlines Regarding Plaintiffs' Case Specific Expert to 11/25/2019 (Woo, Maryanne) (Modified on 10/18/2019 to add party filers) (mk). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/2/2020.]
August 20, 2019 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Timothy D. Miller, Veronica Miller for Plaintiff's Designation and Disclosure of General and Case-Specific Expert Witnesses and Case Specific Expert Report and Curriculum Vitae, and Plaintiff's Non-Retained Expert Disclosures. (Oliver, Alyson) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/2/2020.]
July 23, 2019 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Timothy D. Miller, Veronica Miller for Responses to First Set of Requests for Production. (Oliver, Alyson) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/2/2020.]
July 23, 2019 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Timothy D. Miller, Veronica Miller for Responses to First Set of Interrogatories. (Oliver, Alyson) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/2/2020.]
June 20, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by C. R. Bard, Inc. for Certificate of Service of Discovery Materials. (Woo, Maryanne) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/2/2020.]
June 13, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Maryanne C. Woo on behalf of C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Woo, Maryanne) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/2/2020.]
June 13, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Daniel C. Kirby on behalf of C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Kirby, Daniel) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/2/2020.]
June 6, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Marilyn Ann Moberg on behalf of C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Moberg, Marilyn) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/2/2020.]
May 17, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Brian Patrick Cadigan on behalf of C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Cadigan, Brian) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/2/2020.]
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PRETRIAL ORDER # 305 (Docket Control Order - C. R. Bard Wave 10 Cases) The court ORDERS that the cases on Exhibits A and B are: (1) removed from the pending inactive docket; and (2) placed on the active docket. The court further ORDERS that: (1) The cases are no longer eligible for return to the inactive docket nor may notices of settlement be filed to relieve the parties from scheduling deadlines; (2) To the extent other defendants, in addition to C. R. Bard and Sofradim Production SAS, Tissue Science Laboratories and Covidien entities, are named in the cases on Exhibits A and B, the deadlines below also apply to them; (3) The Clerk will file this Docket Control Order in the main MDL and every case listed on Exhibits A and B become subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order; and (4) The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 10 cases with one important exception, as more fully set forth herein. Scheduling Deadlines. The following deadlines shall apply in all Bard Wave 10 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 05/11/2019. Defendant Fact Sheets due by 05/20/2019. Deadline for written discovery requests due by 06/20/2019. Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs due by 08/19/2019. Expert disclosure served by defendants due by 09/18/2019. Expert disclosure served for rebuttal due by 09/25/2019. Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/25/2019. Filing of dispositive motions due by 11/01/2019. Response to dispositive motions due by 11/15/2019. Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 11/22/2019. Filing of Daubert motions due by 11/04/2019. Responses to Daubert motions due by 11/18/2019. Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/25/2019. Confidential Documents. Issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 9/20/2019, and any response is due by 10/03/2019. Any reply is due by 10/10/2019. Venue Recommendations. The parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases no later than 10/08/2019, the parties are ORDERED to file joint venue recommendations by 10/18/2019. The parties' joint recommendation(s) shall identify cases where venue is in dispute. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/1/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2187; Bard Wave 10 cases identified on Exhibits A and B) (st) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/2/2020.]
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 10/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2187 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2187 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/15/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2187; Cases on inactive docket) (klc) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/2/2020.]
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 INACTIVE DOCKET ORDER: The court has been advised that the plaintiff(s) and C. R. Bard have reached a settlement with regard to Bard. All discovery deadlines are continued until further order of the court. Plaintiff(s) and Bard may submit an agreed order of dismissal with prejudice on or before 8/31/2018; if settlements are not finalized and dismissal orders are not submitted by then the Court will have a hearing to determine the appropriate action pertaining to any remaining cases on the inactive docket. Counsel for plaintiffs and defendant(s) are directed to provide quarterly reports as to their progress in dismissing cases on the inactive docket. This Order is related to the Proposed Inactive Docket Order filed at ECF No. 5802 in MDL Case No. 2187 Bard. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/17/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (brn) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/2/2020.]
March 30, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Michael K. Brown on behalf of C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Brown, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/2/2020.]
March 23, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Michael Laurence Mandell on behalf of C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Mandell, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/2/2020.]
March 23, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kevin George Lohman on behalf of C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Lohman, Kevin) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/2/2020.]
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRETRIAL ORDER # 275 (Docket Control Order - C. R. Bard Wave 7 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING C. R. BARD, INC. CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 7 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. The stay on the Covidien Wave 1 cases is lifted and the Covidien Wave 1 cases are incorporated in the C. R. Bard Wave 7 cases and subject to this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 7 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 7 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2187; Bard Wave 7 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/2/2020.]
June 21, 2017 Filing 12 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Timothy D. Miller, Veronica Miller. (Oliver, Alyson) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/2/2020.]
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 MOTION by Timothy D. Miller, Veronica Miller to Substitute Counsel Alyson Oliver, Oliver Law Group P.C., in lieu of Bajar Dejban, S. Richard Farber, Shawn Khorrami; the Clerk is directed to terminate Bahar Dejban, S. Richard Farber, and Shawn Khorrami as counsel of record for the plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/17/2016. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (ts) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/2/2020.]
February 23, 2016 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Substitute Counsel by Timothy D. Miller, Veronica Miller (Oliver, Alyson) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/2/2020.]
February 9, 2016 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #8 Motion by Timothy D. Miller, Veronica Miller to Substitute Counsel. ERROR: Brief in support attached. CORRECTION: Brief removed and filed using the event Brief In Support, entry #9 . (skh) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/2/2020.]
February 9, 2016 Filing 9 BRIEF by Timothy D. Miller, Veronica Miller in support of #8 MOTION by Timothy D. Miller, Veronica Miller to Substitute Counsel Alyson Oliver, Oliver Law Group P.C., in lieu of Bajar Dejban, S. Richard Farber, Shawn Khorrami (skh) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/2/2020.]
February 9, 2016 Filing 8 MOTION by Timothy D. Miller, Veronica Miller to Substitute Counsel Alyson Oliver, Oliver Law Group P.C., in lieu of Bajar Dejban, S. Richard Farber, Shawn Khorrami (Attachments: #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order)(Oliver, Alyson) (Modified on 2/9/2016 to remove brief in support (attachment #1) and file it as entry #9) (skh). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/2/2020.]
December 3, 2013 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Melissa Foster Bird on behalf of C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Bird, Melissa) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/2/2020.]
November 6, 2013 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Richard B. North, Jr on behalf of C. R. Bard, Inc.. (North, Richard) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/2/2020.]
October 28, 2013 Filing 5 AMENDED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT filed by Timothy D. Miller, Veronica Miller against C. R. Bard, Inc. ("Bard"). (Dejban, Bahar) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/2/2020.]
October 24, 2013 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Richard B. North, Jr. on 10/23/2013. C. R. Bard, Inc. waiver mailed on 10/10/2013, answer due 12/9/2013. (North, Richard) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/2/2020.]
July 22, 2013 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to C. R. Bard, Inc., and Sofradim Production SAS, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (mmw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/2/2020.]
July 18, 2013 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 83 (AMENDED Order Scheduling Future Status Conferences & Other Matters) entered on 07/16/2013 in MDL 2187 to attorneys in member case. (jap) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/2/2020.]
July 11, 2013 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # CHAR006053. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (sas) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/2/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller et al v. C. R. Bard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Miller
Represented By: S Richard Farber
Represented By: Shawn Khorrami
Represented By: Alyson Oliver
Represented By: Bahar Dejban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy D. Miller
Represented By: S Richard Farber
Represented By: Shawn Khorrami
Represented By: Alyson Oliver
Represented By: Bahar Dejban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sofradim Production SAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. R. Bard, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin George Lohman
Represented By: Brian Patrick Cadigan
Represented By: Maryanne C. Woo
Represented By: Michael K. Brown
Represented By: Marilyn Ann Moberg
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Michael Laurence Mandell
Represented By: Daniel C. Kirby
Represented By: Melissa Foster Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?