Envoy Mortgage Ltd v. Connolly et al
Plaintiff: Envoy Mortgage Ltd
Defendant: John Doe, Mark Connolly and Spouse
Case Number: 5:2020cv00039
Filed: January 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2020 Filing 4 APRIL STATUS & SCHEDULING CONFERRENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 4/7/2020 11:10 AM in Chambers before Honorable Patrick R Wyrick. Status Report due by 3/31/2020. (ks)
January 30, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Change of Address by Keith A Daniels (Daniels, Keith)
January 30, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Counterclaim by Envoy Mortgage Ltd.(Daniels, Keith)
January 14, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3074613. (Doyle, Sherry)
January 10, 2020 Western District Case Management Entry: ANSWER, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Envoy Mortgage Ltd. re Petition [1-1] by Mark Connolly.(ks)
January 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Canadian County, case number CJ-2019-730 filed by Mark Connolly, Spouse. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons, #3 Exhibit 3 - Answer, #4 Exhibit 4 - OSCN Docket Sheet, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(ank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Envoy Mortgage Ltd v. Connolly et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Connolly
Represented By: Sherry L Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spouse
Represented By: Sherry L Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Envoy Mortgage Ltd
Represented By: Keith A Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?