Seaton v. Lowes Home Centers LLC
Plaintiff: James Seaton
Defendant: Lowes Home Centers LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00046
Filed: January 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set on the October 2020 trial docket (10/13/2020 09:00 AM) in Courtroom 503 before Honorable Patrick R Wyrick. Motions to join due 30 days from date of this order; Motions to amend due 30 days from date of this order; Pla expert witness list and expert reports due 8/1/2020; Pla witness list due 8/1/2020; Dft witness list due 8/11/2020; Pla exhibit list due 8/1/2020; Dft exhibit list due 8/11/2020; Motions in limine due 9/24/2020; Jury instructions due 9/24/2020; Voir dire requests due 9/24/2020; Trial briefs due 9/24/2020; Discovery due by 9/1/2020. Motions due by 8/1/2020. Pretrial Report due by 9/24/2020. Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 3/3/2020. (ks)
March 2, 2020 Filing 11 ENTER ORDER granting #10 Defendant's Motion for Leave to Appear by Telephone, as long as local counsel appears in person. Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 3/2/2020. (ks)
February 28, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to appear by telephone for status conference on 3/3/20 by Lowes Home Centers LLC. (Schrag, Jeremy)
February 25, 2020 Filing 9 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff James Seaton. (Carson, Joseph)
January 23, 2020 Filing 8 MARCH STATUS & SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 3/3/2020 11:30 AM in Chambers before Honorable Patrick R Wyrick. Status Report due by 2/25/2020. (ks)
January 17, 2020 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew M Gunn on behalf of All Defendants (Gunn, Andrew)
January 16, 2020 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Joseph S Carson on behalf of James Seaton (Carson, Joseph)
January 16, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Lowes Home Centers LLC.(Schrag, Jeremy)
January 16, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeremy K Schrag on behalf of Lowes Home Centers LLC (Schrag, Jeremy)
January 16, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Lowes Home Centers LLC . (Schrag, Jeremy)
January 16, 2020 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Lowes Home Centers LLC. (Schrag, Jeremy)
January 15, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3075504. (Schrag, Jeremy)
January 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Canadian County, case number CJ-2019-770 filed by Lowes Home Centers LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons, #3 Exhibit 3 - Entry of Appearance, #4 Exhibit 4 - Docket sheet, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(ank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seaton v. Lowes Home Centers LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowes Home Centers LLC
Represented By: Jeremy K Schrag
Represented By: Andrew M Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Seaton
Represented By: Joseph S Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?