Rounds et al v. FourPoint Energy, LLC
Plaintiff: Randy Carl Smith and Kenny Wayne Rounds
Defendant: Fourpoint Energy LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00052
Filed: January 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Jodi W Dishman
Referring Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2020 Filing 56 PROTECTIVE ORDER. The Court GRANTS the Joint Motion for Entry of Agreed Protective Order Doc. No. #53 and ENTERS the PROTECTIVE ORDER AS MODIFIED. See Order for further details. Signed by Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 02/24/2020. (nv)
February 21, 2020 Filing 55 STIPULATED ORDER Regarding Discovery, Including Electronically Stored Information and Privileged Materials...See Order for all details. Signed by Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 02/21/2020. (nv)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pla expert witness list and expert reports due 12/18/2020; Dft expert witness list and expert reports due 02/18/2021; Motions in limine due 03/04/2021; Discovery due by 4/16/2021. Class Certification Motion due by 12/18/2020; Dft Class Certification Response and Daubert Motions due by 02/18/2021; Pla Class Certification Reply and Daubert Motions due by 03/18/2021; Class Certification Hearing: TBD... See Scheduling Order for further deadlines and details. Signed by Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 02/20/2020. (nv)
February 11, 2020 Filing 53 JOINT MOTION for Protective Order by Kenny Wayne Rounds, Randy Carl Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Proposed Agreed Protective Order)(Bradford, Reagan)
February 11, 2020 Filing 52 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiffs Kenny Wayne Rounds, Randy Carl Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Proposed Agreed Initial Scheduling Order, #2 Exhibit 2-Proposed Stipulated ESI Order, #3 Exhibit 3-Proposed Agreed Protective Order)(Bradford, Reagan)
February 7, 2020 Filing 51 ENTRY of Appearance by Charles V Knutter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Knutter, Charles)
February 7, 2020 Filing 50 ENTRY of Appearance by David R Gleason on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Gleason, David)
February 7, 2020 Filing 49 ENTRY of Appearance by Margaret E Robertson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Robertson, Margaret)
February 7, 2020 Filing 48 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan K Wilson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Wilson, Ryan)
February 7, 2020 Filing 47 ENTRY of Appearance by Reagan E Bradford on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bradford, Reagan)
February 2, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE FROM THE COURT. Available on the website for the United States District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma, under "Rules & Procedures, Chambers Rules," are the following that are applicable in civil cases in front of Judge Dishman: (1) Chamber Procedures for Civil Cases (issued 1-28-2020) and (2) Civil Cases: Guidelines for Protective Orders on Confidentiality, Sealing Documents, and Redactions (issued 1-29-2020). Parties are expected to comply with these rules for all filings and proceedings going forward. The Court intends to strike filings that fail to comply with these rules. (nv)
January 28, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE (other) by Fourpoint Energy LLC re #39 Order,, Association of Local Counsel (Stahl, Craig)
January 28, 2020 Filing 44 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey T Kuehnle on behalf of Fourpoint Energy LLC (Kuehnle, Jeffrey)
January 28, 2020 Filing 43 ENTRY of Appearance by Craig L Stahl on behalf of Fourpoint Energy LLC (Stahl, Craig)
January 27, 2020 Filing 42 ENTRY of Appearance by Jay P Walters on behalf of Fourpoint Energy LLC (Walters, Jay)
January 24, 2020 Filing 41 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Fourpoint Energy LLC . (Stahl, Craig)
January 22, 2020 Filing 40 STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 2/20/2020 at 09:00 AM in Chambers before the Honorable Jodi W. Dishman. Status Report due by 2/11/2020. (nv)
January 22, 2020 Filing 39 ENTER ORDER. This action was transferred from the United States District Court for the District of Colorado on January 15, 2020 Doc. No. #36 . Defendant's only counsel of record are Craig L. Stahl and Jeffrey T. Kuehnle, whose offices are in The Woodlands, Texas. The Local Rules of this Court require non-resident attorneys who do not maintain an office in Oklahoma to associate with local counsel. LCvR83.3(a). Accordingly, counsel for Defendant are directed to comply with this rule or move the Court for relief under LCvR83.3(c) no later than January 29, 2020. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 01/22/20. (nv)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER A review of the filings in this case reveals that Defendant FourPoint Energy, LLC filed a Corporate Disclosure Statement Doc. No. #21 while this matter was pending before the United States District Court for the District of Colorado. This case was thereafter transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma Doc. No. #35 . The local rules of this district require parties formed as a limited liability company or partnership to file a disclosure statement identifying the entitys constituents and, in cases where one of the parties has invoked diversity,affirmatively stating whether any of the members or partners are citizens of the adversarys alleged state of citizenship. LCvR7.1.1. Defendants filed Corporate Disclosure Statement does not comply with this rule.This Court therefore ORDERS Defendant FourPoint Energy, LLC to file asupplemental Disclosure Statement in compliance with LCvR 7.1.1 within 7 days of this Order. A form is available on the Court's website (http://www.okwd.uscourts.gov/wp-content/uploads/Corporate_Disclosure_Form.pdf). Signed by Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 01/17/2020. (em)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Jodi W. Dishman for all further proceedings. Honorable Scott L. Palk no longer assigned to case. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 1/16/20. (md)
January 15, 2020 Filing 36 Case transferred in from District of Colorado; Case Number 1:19-cv-02878.
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Granting #28 Motion to Transfer Case. This case shall be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma. By Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 01/15/2020. (athom, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/15/2020.]
January 15, 2020 Filing 34 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Scheduling Conference held on 1/15/2020. FTR: A1002. (cthom, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/15/2020.]
January 10, 2020 Filing 33 TRANSCRIPT of TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 12/12/2019 before Magistrate Judge Hegarty. Pages: 1-28. Prepared by: AB Court Reporting & Video, Inc.. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (AB Court Reporting & Video, Inc., ) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/15/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 32 REPLY to Response to #28 MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District of Oklahoma filed by Defendant FourPoint Energy, LLC. (Stahl, Craig) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/15/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 31 RESPONSE to #28 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Western District of Oklahoma filed by Plaintiffs Kenny Wayne Rounds, Randy Carl Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Smith Check Stubs, #2 Exhibit 2-FourPoint's Initial Disclosures, #3 Exhibit 3-Other Initial Disclosures, #4 Exhibit 4-Apache Class Cert Transcript)(Bradford, Reagan) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/15/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Filing 30 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Scheduling Conference held on 12/12/2019. The Scheduling Conference is reset for 1/15/2020 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. FTR: A501. (cthom, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/15/2020.]
December 5, 2019 Filing 29 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant FourPoint Energy, LLC. (Stahl, Craig) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/15/2020.]
December 5, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Transfer Case by Defendant FourPoint Energy, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Nessinger Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B-Pls First Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit C-Previous Complaints WD OK, #4 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order Granting Mtn to Transfer)(Stahl, Craig) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/15/2020.]
November 8, 2019 Filing 27 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #20 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorney Craig L. Stahl; Jeffrey T. Kuehnle. The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (athom, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/15/2020.]
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 11/8/2019. Text Only Entry (dddlc3, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/15/2020.]
November 7, 2019 Filing 25 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #23 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-02878-DDD. (Text Only Entry) (tsher, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/15/2020.]
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER re: #23 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge filed by Randy Carl Smith, Kenny Wayne Rounds by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/7/2019. Parties do not consent. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to reassign this case under D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(a). (tsher, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/15/2020.]
November 7, 2019 Filing 23 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiffs Kenny Wayne Rounds, Randy Carl Smith All parties do not consent.. (Bradford, Reagan) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/15/2020.]
November 6, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Related Cases by Defendant FourPoint Energy, LLC (Stahl, Craig) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/15/2020.]
November 6, 2019 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent FourPoint Holdings, LLC for FourPoint Energy, LLC. (Stahl, Craig) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/15/2020.]
November 6, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Jeffrey T. Kuehnle by Craig L. Stahl on behalf of FourPoint Energy, LLC (Stahl, Craig) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/15/2020.]
November 6, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Craig L. Stahl by Craig L. Stahl on behalf of FourPoint Energy, LLC (Stahl, Craig) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/15/2020.]
November 6, 2019 Filing 18 Defendant's Original ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint of Plaintiffs Attorney Craig L. Stahl added to party FourPoint Energy, LLC(pty:dft) by FourPoint Energy, LLC.(Stahl, Craig) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/15/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading re #15 Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Kenny Wayne Rounds, Randy Carl Smith (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Redlined Complaint)(Bradford, Reagan) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/15/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/23/2019 re: #15 Amended Complaint filed by Randy Carl Smith, Kenny Wayne Rounds. Notice due by 10/31/2019. (tsher, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/15/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against FourPoint Energy, LLC, filed by Kenny Wayne Rounds, Randy Carl Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Rounds Lease, #2 Exhibit 2- Smith Lease)(Bradford, Reagan) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/15/2020.]
October 10, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Charles Vance Knutter on behalf of Kenny Wayne Rounds, Randy Carl SmithAttorney Charles Vance Knutter added to party Kenny Wayne Rounds(pty:pla), Attorney Charles Vance Knutter added to party Randy Carl Smith(pty:pla) (Knutter, Charles) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/15/2020.]
October 10, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David Randolph Gleason on behalf of Kenny Wayne Rounds, Randy Carl SmithAttorney David Randolph Gleason added to party Kenny Wayne Rounds(pty:pla), Attorney David Randolph Gleason added to party Randy Carl Smith(pty:pla) (Gleason, David) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/15/2020.]
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/9/2019. Consent Form due by 11/22/2019. Proposed Scheduling Order due 11/21/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 12/12/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/15/2020.]
October 9, 2019 Filing 11 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (angar, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/15/2020.]
October 9, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-2878-MEH (angar, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/15/2020.]
October 9, 2019 Filing 9 Amended SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/15/2020.]
October 9, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/15/2020.]
October 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ryan Keith Wilson on behalf of Kenny Wayne Rounds, Randy Carl SmithAttorney Ryan Keith Wilson added to party Kenny Wayne Rounds(pty:pla), Attorney Ryan Keith Wilson added to party Randy Carl Smith(pty:pla) (Wilson, Ryan) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/15/2020.]
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Margaret Elizabeth Robertson on behalf of Kenny Wayne Rounds, Randy Carl SmithAttorney Margaret Elizabeth Robertson added to party Kenny Wayne Rounds(pty:pla), Attorney Margaret Elizabeth Robertson added to party Randy Carl Smith(pty:pla) (Robertson, Margaret) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/15/2020.]
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Reagan Edward Bradford on behalf of Kenny Wayne Rounds, Randy Carl Smith (Bradford, Reagan) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/15/2020.]
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS REQUEST as to FourPoint Energy, LLC by Plaintiffs Kenny Wayne Rounds, Randy Carl Smith. (Bradford, Reagan) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/15/2020.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (alave, ) Modified on 10/9/2019 to correct file date. (alave, ). [Transferred from Colorado on 1/15/2020.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number COX092312 (trvo, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/15/2020.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FourPoint Energy, LLC (Filing fee $ 400).Attorney Reagan Edward Bradford added to party Kenny Wayne Rounds(pty:pla), Attorney Reagan Edward Bradford added to party Randy Carl Smith(pty:pla), filed by Kenny Wayne Rounds, Randy Carl Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Oil and Gas Lease, #2 Exhibit 2-Oil and Gas Lease, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bradford, Reagan) [Transferred from Colorado on 1/15/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rounds et al v. FourPoint Energy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fourpoint Energy LLC
Represented By: Craig L Stahl
Represented By: Jeffrey T Kuehnle
Represented By: Jay P Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Carl Smith
Represented By: Margaret E Robertson
Represented By: Ryan K Wilson
Represented By: David R Gleason
Represented By: Charles V Knutter
Represented By: Reagan E Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenny Wayne Rounds
Represented By: Reagan E Bradford
Represented By: Margaret E Robertson
Represented By: Ryan K Wilson
Represented By: David R Gleason
Represented By: Charles V Knutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?