Devon Energy Production Company LP et al v. United States Department of the Interior
Plaintiff: Devon Energy Corporation and Devon Energy Production Company LP
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior
Case Number: 5:2020cv00053
Filed: January 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 34 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #32 Brief, #30 Brief, #33 Response of Opening Brief by Devon Energy Corporation, Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Leggette, Lyle)
August 17, 2020 Filing 33 RESPONSE re #32 Brief - Amended Brief filed by United States Department of the Interior. (Spurlock, Alison)
July 20, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma (OKWD) is upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) on Monday, August 3, 2020. Complete information regarding the OKWD NextGen CM/ECF implementation is available at #http://www.okwd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-information.****Currently, you may share a single PACER account with other attorneys in your firm. With the new OKWD NextGen CM/ECF system, sharing of individual PACER accounts is prohibited. You must have an individual upgraded PACER account linked to your e-filing account. Once again, shared PACER accounts cannot be used by OKWD e-filing attorneys. ****Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one is to upgrade your PACER account and step two is to link your upgraded PACER account to the OKWD e-filing account in the upgraded NextGen CM/ECF system. This notice only addresses the first step because the second step cannot be completed until on or after August 3, 2020. ****Many PACER accounts have already been upgraded. The first step is to determine whether you have an "Upgraded" PACER account. If any of the following is true, you have an upgraded PACER account and no action is required until after the OKWD NextGen CM/ECF upgrade on August 3, 2020: 1) You have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or 2) Your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014. If neither of these is true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you can link your PACER account to your new NextGen CM/ECF account. ****OKWDs current CM/ECF system will NOT be available from 11:00 AM on 07/31/20 until 8:00 AM on 08/03/20 due to the upgrade. ****Additional notices will be sent at a later date regarding the second step of this process. If you have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6856 or the OKWD Clerk's Office CM/ECF Help Desk at 405-609-5555. (Pigott, William) (ADI)
July 20, 2020 Filing 32 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #31 Order, #29 Brief Amended Brief by Devon Energy Corporation, Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Leggette, Lyle)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting #30 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to File Amended Opening Brief. Amended Opening Brief due within 3 days. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 7/20/2020. (mb)
July 20, 2020 Filing 30 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #29 Brief (AMENDED OPENING BRIEF) by Devon Energy Corporation, Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Amended Opening Brief)(Leggette, Lyle)
July 17, 2020 Filing 29 BRIEF IN SUPPORT by Devon Energy Corporation, Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Leggette, Lyle)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Plaintiff Devon Energy Production Company, L.P.'s Unopposed Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record. Documents submitted as attachment 1 to the Motion [Doc. No. 27-1] and Bates numbered AR_8675-76 and AR_8677 shall be included in the Administrative Record submitted by Defendant as Exhibits A and B to Plaintiffs Statement of Reasons and Request for Hearing (AR_0095-0135). Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 7/16/2020. (mb)
July 14, 2020 Filing 27 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Supplement Administrative Record by Devon Energy Corporation, Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Attachment AR_8675-AR_8677 SoR Exhibits A and B, #2 Attachment Proposed Order)(Leggette, Lyle)
June 23, 2020 Filing 26 Conventionally Filed Exhibit: #25 NOTICE of Conventional Filing of the Administrative Record by Defendant United States Department of the Interior; 11 binders taken to chambers, 12 binders placed in file room. (kmt)
June 23, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Conventional Filing of the Administrative Record by Alison Spurlock on behalf of United States Department of the Interior (Spurlock, Alison)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Joint Motion for Order to File Designated Portions of the Administrative Record Under Seal. Defendant isauthorized to submit under seal the portions of the Administrative Record designated inExhibit 1 not later than 6/23/2020. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 6/17/2020. (mb)
June 16, 2020 Filing 23 JOINT MOTION to Seal (Designated Portions of Administrative Record) by Devon Energy Corporation, Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Leggette, Lyle)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Joint Motion to Enter a First Revised Scheduling Order. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 6/10/2020. (mb)
June 9, 2020 Filing 21 JOINT MOTION to Amend/Correct #16 Order on Motion for Order,,, (First Revised Scheduling Order) by Devon Energy Corporation, Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Leggette, Lyle)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying #19 Defendant 's Motion for Order to File Administrative Record Under Seal. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 6/8/2020. (mb)
June 5, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to File Administrative Record Under Seal by United States Department of the Interior. (Spurlock, Alison)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Administrative Record. Administrative Record due 6/9/2020. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 6/4/2020. (mb)
June 2, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Administrative Record by United States Department of the Interior. (Spurlock, Alison)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Joint Motion to Enter Scheduling Order and Strike Requirement for a Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan. Defendant to submit Administrative Record due 6/2/2020; Motion to supplement AdministrativeRecord due 6/16/2020; response to Motion to Supplement due 6/30/2020; Plaintiff to file Opening Brief 24 days after Court issues decision onMotion to Supplement; Defendant to file Response Brief 31 days after filing ofOpening Brief; Plaintiff to file Reply Brief 21 days after filing of Response Brief; Sur-Reply Brief (if authorized, upon motion and leave of court) due 21 days later. Parties are authorized to file opening and response briefs not to exceed 40 pages and a reply brief not to exceed 20 pages. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 5/26/2020. (mb)
May 22, 2020 Filing 15 JOINT MOTION for Order (Entry of Scheduling Order) by Devon Energy Corporation, Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Scheduling Order)(Leggette, Lyle)
May 6, 2020 Filing 14 DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 6/4/2020 11:00 AM in Chambers before Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti. Status Report due by 6/1/2020. (mb)
April 23, 2020 Filing 13 SUBPOENA Returned Executed by Devon Energy Production Company LP, Devon Energy Corporation as to United States Department of the Interior. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Service, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration)(Leggette, Lyle)
April 23, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by United States Department of the Interior.(Spurlock, Alison)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise plead United States Department of the Interior answer or response due 4/23/2020.. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 3/19/2020. (mb)
March 18, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move, or Otherwise Plead by United States Department of the Interior. (Spurlock, Alison)
March 18, 2020 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Alison Spurlock on behalf of United States Department of the Interior (Spurlock, Alison)
January 16, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Department of the Interior. (kmt)
January 16, 2020 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Rosario C Doriott Dominguez on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Doriott Dominguez, Rosario)
January 16, 2020 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Lyle P Leggette on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Leggette, Lyle)
January 16, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Mark B McDaniel on behalf of All Plaintiffs (McDaniel, Mark)
January 16, 2020 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by All Plaintiffs . (McDaniel, Mark)
January 16, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by All Plaintiffs . (McDaniel, Mark)
January 16, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3076522. (Leggette, Lyle)
January 16, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Department of the Interior. (kmt)
January 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Department of the Interior filed by Devon Energy Production Company LP, Devon Energy Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Devon Energy Production Company LP et al v. United States Department of the Interior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devon Energy Corporation
Represented By: Rosario C Doriott Dominguez
Represented By: Mark B McDaniel
Represented By: Lyle P Leggette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devon Energy Production Company LP
Represented By: Rosario C Doriott Dominguez
Represented By: Mark B McDaniel
Represented By: Lyle P Leggette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior
Represented By: Alison Spurlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?