Driver et al v. AMC Military Housing et al
Plaintiff: Jeff Driver, Janna Driver and Andrew Bennett
Defendant: AMC Military Housing, Smith Brothers Heat and Air Ltd, Balfour Beatty Communities and Blackmon Mooring of Oklahoma City Inc
Case Number: 5:2020cv00055
Filed: January 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2020 Filing 8 DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 4/7/2020 01:30 PM in Chambers before Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti. Status Report due by 4/2/2020. (mb)
February 26, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Mailing Discovery. (Garrett, Bryan)
January 31, 2020 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Bryan G Garrett on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Garrett, Bryan)
January 17, 2020 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Balfour Beatty Communities . (Willis, W)
January 17, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Removal. (Willis, W)
January 17, 2020 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Linda G Kaufmann on behalf of Balfour Beatty Communities (Kaufmann, Linda)
January 17, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by W Brett Willis on behalf of Balfour Beatty Communities (Willis, W)
January 17, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3077282. (Willis, W)
January 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2019-3047 filed by Balfour Beatty Communities. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Docket Report, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, 05-31-2019, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons served on Blackmon Mooring, 06-05-2019, #4 Exhibit 4 - Summons served on Balfour Beatty, #5 Exhibit 5 - Answer of AMC Military Housing, #6 Exhibit 6 - Answer of BBC, #7 Exhibit 7 - Entry of Appearance by WBW, #8 Exhibit 8 - Special Entry of Appearance and Reservation of Time, Blackmon Mooring, 06-26-2019, #9 Exhibit 9 - Answer of Blackmon Mooring, 07-15-2019, #10 Exhibit 10 - Amended Answer of BBC AF Management - Development, LLC, 07-15-2019, #11 Exhibit 11 - Summons served on Smith Brothers, 09-23-2019, #12 Exhibit 12 - Special Appearance with Motion to Dismiss by Smith Brothers, 10-10-2019, #13 Exhibit 13 - Motion to Withdraw by Ward and Glass, 10-17-2019, #14 Exhibit 14 - Amended Motion to Withdraw by Ward & Glass and Schumacher, 10-30-2019, #15 Exhibit 15 - Agreed Order Allowing Motion to Withdraw, 11-19-2019, #16 Exhibit 16 - Motion to Associate Counsel, 12-12-2019, #17 Exhibit 17 - Order granting Motion for Admission by Richard Morgan, 01-02-2020, #18 Exhibit 18 - EOA by Garrett, 12-13-2019, #19 Exhibit 19 - Dismissal by Andrew Bennett, 12-17-2019, #20 Exhibit 20 - Dismissal of AMC Military Housing, Smith Brothers and Blackmon Mooring, 12-17-2019, #21 Exhibit 21 - BBC Entity Details, State of Delaware, #22 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Driver et al v. AMC Military Housing et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMC Military Housing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith Brothers Heat and Air Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Balfour Beatty Communities
Represented By: Linda G Kaufmann
Represented By: W Brett Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackmon Mooring of Oklahoma City Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Driver
Represented By: Woodrow K Glass
Represented By: Jonathan M Irwin
Represented By: Tanner B France
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janna Driver
Represented By: Woodrow K Glass
Represented By: Jonathan M Irwin
Represented By: Tanner B France
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Bennett
Represented By: Woodrow K Glass
Represented By: Jonathan M Irwin
Represented By: Tanner B France
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?