Hunter v. McKesson Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Mike Hunter
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp, McKesson Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, Cardinal Health 110 LLC, Amerisourcebergen Corp, Cardinal Health 105 Inc and Cardinal Health 108 LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00090
Filed: January 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Robin J Cauthron
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Mike Hunter (Burrage, Michael)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #35 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Attorney Alexander Ely. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 02/12/20. (wh)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #34 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Attorney Emily Rae Woods. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 02/12/20. (wh)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #33 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Attorney Timothy Hester. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 02/12/20. (wh)
February 11, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Alex Ely Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-3094036 by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Campbell, Stuart)
February 11, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Rae Woods Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-3094029 by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Campbell, Stuart)
February 11, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Timothy Hester Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-3094025 by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Campbell, Stuart)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 02/07/20. (wh)
February 7, 2020 Filing 31 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time of Deadlines, Stay of Response and Preliminary Schedule by All Defendants. (Campbell, Stuart)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Leave to File Oversized Brief. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 02/06/20. (wh)
February 6, 2020 Filing 29 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael J Hunter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hunter, Michael)
February 4, 2020 Filing 28 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Cardinal Health 110 LLC . (Ray, Ryan)
February 4, 2020 Filing 27 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Cardinal Health 108 LLC . (Ray, Ryan)
February 4, 2020 Filing 26 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Cardinal Health 105 Inc . (Ray, Ryan)
February 4, 2020 Filing 25 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Cardinal Health Inc . (Ray, Ryan)
February 4, 2020 Filing 24 ENTRY of Appearance by Ethan A Shaner on behalf of Mike Hunter (Shaner, Ethan)
February 4, 2020 Filing 23 ENTRY of Appearance by Charlotte A Dillsaver on behalf of Mike Hunter (Dillsaver, Charlotte)
February 4, 2020 Filing 22 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File Oversized Brief by All Defendants. (Campbell, Stuart)
February 4, 2020 Filing 21 ENTRY of Appearance by James E Warner, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Warner, James)
February 4, 2020 Filing 20 ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew G Pate on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Pate, Andrew)
February 4, 2020 Filing 19 ENTRY of Appearance by Trey N Duck, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Duck, Trey)
February 4, 2020 Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by Lisa P Baldwin on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Baldwin, Lisa)
February 4, 2020 Filing 17 ENTRY of Appearance by D Michael McBride, III on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Corp, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp (McBride, D)
February 4, 2020 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Amerisourcebergen Corp . (Huntsman, Susan)
February 4, 2020 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp . (Huntsman, Susan)
February 4, 2020 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Susan E Huntsman on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Corp, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp (Huntsman, Susan)
February 4, 2020 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Bradley E Beckworth on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Beckworth, Bradley)
February 4, 2020 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Randa K Reeves on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Reeves, Randa)
February 4, 2020 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Reggie N Whitten on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Whitten, Reggie)
February 4, 2020 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael Burrage on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Burrage, Michael)
February 3, 2020 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health 110 LLC (Ray, Ryan)
February 3, 2020 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health 108 LLC (Ray, Ryan)
February 3, 2020 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health 105 Inc (Ray, Ryan)
February 3, 2020 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health Inc (Ray, Ryan)
February 3, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Kaylee P Davis-Maddy on behalf of McKesson Corporation (Davis-Maddy, Kaylee)
February 3, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Lewis N Carter on behalf of McKesson Corporation (Carter, Lewis)
January 31, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3087431. (Campbell, Stuart)
January 31, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by McKesson Corporation . (Campbell, Stuart)
January 31, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Stuart D Campbell on behalf of McKesson Corporation (Campbell, Stuart)
January 31, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Cleveland County, case number CJ-2020-39 filed by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Suggestion of Remand, #2 Exhibit 2 - Docket, #3 Exhibit 3- Petition, #4 Exhibit 4- EOA, #5 Exhibit 5- EOA, #6 Exhibit 6- EOA, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(rb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter v. McKesson Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp
Represented By: D Michael McBride, III
Represented By: Susan E Huntsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Kaylee P Davis-Maddy
Represented By: Stuart D Campbell
Represented By: Lewis N Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc
Represented By: Ryan A Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 110 LLC
Represented By: Ryan A Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Corp
Represented By: D Michael McBride, III
Represented By: Susan E Huntsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 105 Inc
Represented By: Ryan A Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 108 LLC
Represented By: Ryan A Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Hunter
Represented By: Charlotte A Dillsaver
Represented By: Nathan B Hall
Represented By: Lisa P Baldwin
Represented By: Brooke A Churchman
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Represented By: Michael J Hunter
Represented By: Bradley E Beckworth
Represented By: Trey N Duck, III
Represented By: Randa K Reeves
Represented By: Jeffrey J Angelovich
Represented By: Reggie N Whitten
Represented By: Ethan A Shaner
Represented By: Andrew G Pate
Represented By: James E Warner, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?