Murphy v. Kelly Restaurant Group LLC
Plaintiff: Allen Murphy
Defendant: Kelly Restaurant Group LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00106
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: David L Russell
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions in limine due 10/23/20; Jury instructions due 10/23/20; Voir dire requests due 10/23/20; Discovery due by 10/2/2020. Jury Trial set for 11/3/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 302 before Honorable David L. Russell. Motions due by 9/1/2020. Pretrial Report due by 10/23/2020.. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 3/24/20. (jw)
March 23, 2020 Filing 9 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff Allen Murphy. (Jackson, Scott)
March 18, 2020 Filing 8 ENTER ORDER re #7 Docket; Pursuant to General Order 20-5, the status/scheduling conference on this matter set for April 2, 2020, is STRICKEN. A scheduling order will be entered based on the joint status report and discovery plan. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 3/18/20. (jw)
February 12, 2020 Filing 7 DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 4/2/2020 09:45 AM Room 3423 before Honorable David L. Russell. Status Report due by 3/23/2020. (jw)
February 11, 2020 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Allen Murphy. (Jackson, Scott)
February 11, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Scott R Jackson on behalf of Allen Murphy (Jackson, Scott)
February 10, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert P Coffey, Jr on behalf of Kelly Restaurant Group LLC (Coffey, Robert)
February 10, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Kelly Restaurant Group LLC.(Morsman, Andrew)
February 10, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew B Morsman on behalf of Kelly Restaurant Group LLC (Morsman, Andrew)
February 10, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Notice of Removal Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3092692. (Morsman, Andrew)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Payne County, case number CJ-2019-336 filed by Kelly Restaurant Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-OSCN Case Details, #2 Exhibit 2- Petition, #3 Exhibit 3-Summons issued to Kelly Rest, #4 Exhibit 4-Summons return, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy v. Kelly Restaurant Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Murphy
Represented By: Scott R Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Restaurant Group LLC
Represented By: Andrew B Morsman
Represented By: Robert P Coffey, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?