Miller v. Stauffer et al
Plaintiff: Robert Miller
Defendant: FNU Stauffer and Board of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County
Case Number: 5:2020cv00126
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2020 Filing 7 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Board of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County. (Etherington, Aaron)
March 10, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Robert Miller. (Bonzie, E)
February 18, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Board of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County. (Etherington, Aaron)
February 14, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Aaron C Etherington on behalf of Board of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County (Etherington, Aaron)
February 14, 2020 Filing 3 Receipt for Money Received from Board of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County in the amount of $400.00, receipt number OKW500078618 regarding #1 Notice of Removal, (rb)
February 14, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Rodney J Heggy on behalf of Board of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County (Heggy, Rodney)
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2020-476 filed by Board of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Dockert CJ-2020-476, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(ank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Stauffer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Stauffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County
Represented By: Aaron C Etherington
Represented By: Rodney J Heggy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Miller
Represented By: E Ed Bonzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?