Arndt et al v. Hatfield et al
Plaintiff: David Arndt
Defendant: Taylor Henderson, Barbara Hatfield, Greg Treat, Marilyn Stark, Janet Peery, David Halley, Mark Hixson, Shannon Mallam, Jack McCurdy, Michael Fields, Jon Echols, Nathan Dahm, Paul Hesse, Bob Hughey, Kevin West, Michael Figgins, Charles McCall, Justin Kemp, Angela Berry, Candice Shultz, Jason Davis, Kim Garrett, Kevin Stitt, Stacy Dillard, Jeramy Jarman, Mark Lawson, Denise Brewer, Mike Hunter, Tiffany Monte, Maria Hurst, Carmen Flores, Justin Brown, Lonnie Paxton and Rhonda Baker
Case Number: 5:2020cv00181
Filed: February 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: David L Russell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to Rhonda Baker(In her Official Capacity as House Representative for District 60), Rhonda Baker(Individually), Angela Berry(In her official capacity as an attorney for the Department of Human Services for the State of Oklahoma), Angela Berry(Individually), Denise Brewer(Individually), Denise Brewer(In her official capacity as House Representative for District 71), Justin Brown(In his official capacity as Director of the Department of Human Services for the State of Oklahoma), Justin Brown(Individually), Nathan Dahm(In his official capacity as Senator for district 33), Nathan Dahm(Individually), Jason Davis(In his official capacity as Department of Human Services Child Welfare Supervisor), Jason Davis(Individually), Stacy Dillard(Individually), Stacy Dillard(In her official capacity as an attorney for the Department of Human Services for the state of Oklahoma), Jon Echols(In his official capacity as Majority Floor Leader/Representative for District 90 for the State of Oklahoma), Jon Echols(Individually), Michael Fields(Individually), Michael Fields(In his official capacity as District Attorney for Canadian County Oklahoma), Michael Figgins(In his official capacity as Executive Director with Legal Aid Services of Oklahoma Inc), Michael Figgins(Individually), Carmen Flores(Individually), Carmen Flores(In her official capacity as Deparment of Human Services Child Welfare Supervisor), Kim Garrett(Individually), Kim Garrett(In her official capacity as CEO and Founder of Palomar), David Halley(In his official capacity as Attorney), David Halley(Individually), Barbara Hatfield(Individually), Barbara Hatfield(In her official capacity as Special District Judge for Canadian County, OK), Taylor Henderson(In her official capacity as Director of Council on Judicial Complaints for the State of Oklahoma), Taylor Henderson(Individually), Paul Hesse(Individually), Paul Hesse(In his official capacity as Elected Judge for Canadian County Oklahoma), Mark Hixson(In his official capacity as Attorney), Mark Hixson(Individually), Bob Hughey(Individually), Bob Hughey(In his official capacity as Elected Judge for Canadian County Oklahoma), Mike Hunter(Individually), Mike Hunter(In his official capacity as Attorney General for the State of Oklahoma), Maria Hurst(In her official capacity as Court Clerk for Canadian County, OK), Maria Hurst(Individually), Jeramy Jarman(In his official capacity as Attorney), Jeramy Jarman(Individually), Justin Kemp(Individually), Justin Kemp(In his official capacity as Assistant District Attorney for Canadian County Oklahoma), Mark Lawson(In his official capacity as Representative for district 30 for the State of Oklahoma), Mark Lawson(Individually), Shannon Mallam(In her official capacity as Department of Human Services Child Welfar investigator), Shannon Mallam(Individually), Charles McCall(Individually), Charles McCall(In his official capacity as Speaker of the House/Representative for district 22 for the state of Oklahoma), Jack McCurdy(Individually), Jack McCurdy(In his official capacity as Elected Judge for Canadian County Oklahoma), Suzanne Mitchell, Tiffany Monte(In her official capacity as Department of Human Services Child Welfare investigator), Tiffany Monte(Individually), Lonnie Paxton(In his Official Capacity as Senator for District 23), Lonnie Paxton(Individually), Janet Peery(In her official capacity as Chief Executive Officer of the YWCAOKC), Janet Peery(Individually), Candice Shultz(Individually), Candice Shultz(In her official capacity as Legal Secretary for David Halley), Marilyn Stark(In her official capacity as Representative for district 100 for the State of Oklahoma), Marilyn Stark(Individually), Kevin Stitt(In his official capacity as Governor for the State of Oklahoma), Kevin Stitt(Individually), Greg Treat(In his official capacity as President Pro Tempore/Senator for district 47 for the State of Oklahoma), Greg Treat(Individually), Kevin West(Individually), Kevin West(In his official capacity as Representative for district 54 for the State of Oklahoma). (kmt)
March 20, 2020 Filing 6 PRO SE LITIGANT'S REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF 34 SUMMONS(ES) by David Arndt. (kmt)
March 17, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Angela Berry(In her official capacity as an attorney for the Department of Human Services for the State of Oklahoma), Angela Berry(Individually), Denise Brewer(Individually), Denise Brewer(In her official capacity as House Representative for District 71), Justin Brown(In his official capacity as Director of the Department of Human Services for the State of Oklahoma), Justin Brown(Individually), Nathan Dahm(In his official capacity as Senator for district 33), Nathan Dahm(Individually), Jason Davis(In his official capacity as Department of Human Services Child Welfare Supervisor), Jason Davis(Individually), Stacy Dillard(Individually), Stacy Dillard(In her official capacity as an attorney for the Department of Human Services for the state of Oklahoma), Jon Echols(In his official capacity as Majority Floor Leader/Representative for District 90 for the State of Oklahoma), Jon Echols(Individually), Michael Fields(Individually), Michael Fields(In his official capacity as District Attorney for Canadian County Oklahoma), Michael Figgins(In his official capacity as Executive Director with Legal Aid Services of Oklahoma Inc), Michael Figgins(Individually), Carmen Flores(Individually), Carmen Flores(In her official capacity as Deparment of Human Services Child Welfare Supervisor), Kim Garrett(Individually), Kim Garrett(In her official capacity as CEO and Founder of Palomar), David Halley(In his official capacity as Attorney), David Halley(Individually), Barbara Hatfield(Individually), Barbara Hatfield(In her official capacity as Special District Judge for Canadian County, OK), Taylor Henderson(In her official capacity as Director of Council on Judicial Complaints for the State of Oklahoma), Taylor Henderson(Individually), Paul Hesse(Individually), Paul Hesse(In his official capacity as Elected Judge for Canadian County Oklahoma), Mark Hixson(In his official capacity as Attorney), Mark Hixson(Individually), Bob Hughey(Individually), Bob Hughey(In his official capacity as Elected Judge for Canadian County Oklahoma), Mike Hunter(Individually), Mike Hunter(In his official capacity as Attorney General for the State of Oklahoma), Maria Hurst(In her official capacity as Court Clerk for Canadian County, OK), Maria Hurst(Individually), Jeramy Jarman(In his official capacity as Attorney), Jeramy Jarman(Individually), Justin Kemp(Individually), Justin Kemp(In his official capacity as Assistant District Attorney for Canadian County Oklahoma), Mark Lawson(In his official capacity as Representative for district 30 for the State of Oklahoma), Mark Lawson(Individually), Shannon Mallam(In her official capacity as Department of Human Services Child Welfar investigator), Shannon Mallam(Individually), Charles McCall(Individually), Charles McCall(In his official capacity as Speaker of the House/Representative for district 22 for the state of Oklahoma), Jack McCurdy(Individually), Jack McCurdy(In his official capacity as Elected Judge for Canadian County Oklahoma), Suzanne Mitchell, Tiffany Monte(In her official capacity as Department of Human Services Child Welfare investigator), Tiffany Monte(Individually), Janet Peery(In her official capacity as Chief Executive Officer of the YWCAOKC), Janet Peery(Individually), Candice Shultz(Individually), Candice Shultz(In her official capacity as Legal Secretary for David Halley), Marilyn Stark(In her official capacity as Representative for district 100 for the State of Oklahoma), Marilyn Stark(Individually), Kevin Stitt(In his official capacity as Governor for the State of Oklahoma), Kevin Stitt(Individually), Greg Treat(In his official capacity as President Pro Tempore/Senator for district 47 for the State of Oklahoma), Greg Treat(Individually), Kevin West(Individually), Kevin West(In his official capacity as Representative for district 54 for the State of Oklahoma) filed by David Arndt, David Arndt.(kmt)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 3/3/20. (lb)
March 3, 2020 Filing 3 ENTER ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by David Arndt.Motions referred to Suzanne Mitchell. Signed by the direction of Honorable David L. Russell on 3/3/20. (kmt)
February 28, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David Arndt, David Arndt. (kmt)
February 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Angela Berry(In her official capacity as an attorney for the Department of Human Services for the State of Oklahoma), Angela Berry(Individually), Denise Brewer(Individually), Denise Brewer(In her official capacity as House Representative for District 71), Justin Brown(In his official capacity as Director of the Department of Human Services for the State of Oklahoma), Justin Brown(Individually), Nathan Dahm(In his official capacity as Senator for district 33), Nathan Dahm(Individually), Jason Davis(In his official capacity as Department of Human Services Child Welfare Supervisor), Jason Davis(Individually), Stacy Dillard(Individually), Stacy Dillard(In her official capacity as an attorney for the Department of Human Services for the state of Oklahoma), Jon Echols(In his official capacity as Majority Floor Leader/Representative for District 90 for the State of Oklahoma), Jon Echols(Individually), Michael Fields(Individually), Michael Fields(In his official capacity as District Attorney for Canadian County Oklahoma), Michael Figgins(In his official capacity as Executive Director with Legal Aid Services of Oklahoma Inc), Michael Figgins(Individually), Carmen Flores(Individually), Carmen Flores(In her official capacity as Deparment of Human Services Child Welfare Supervisor), Kim Garrett(Individually), Kim Garrett(In her official capacity as CEO and Founder of Palomar), David Halley(In his official capacity as Attorney), David Halley(Individually), Barbara Hatfield(Individually), Barbara Hatfield(In her official capacity as Special District Judge for Canadian County, OK), Taylor Henderson(In her official capacity as Director of Council on Judicial Complaints for the State of Oklahoma), Taylor Henderson(Individually), Paul Hesse(Individually), Paul Hesse(In his official capacity as Elected Judge for Canadian County Oklahoma), Mark Hixson(In his official capacity as Attorney), Mark Hixson(Individually), Bob Hughey(Individually), Bob Hughey(In his official capacity as Elected Judge for Canadian County Oklahoma), Mike Hunter(Individually), Mike Hunter(In his official capacity as Attorney General for the State of Oklahoma), Maria Hurst(In her official capacity as Court Clerk for Canadian County, OK), Maria Hurst(Individually), Jeramy Jarman(In his official capacity as Attorney), Jeramy Jarman(Individually), Justin Kemp(Individually), Justin Kemp(In his official capacity as Assistant District Attorney for Canadian County Oklahoma), Mark Lawson(In his official capacity as Representative for district 30 for the State of Oklahoma), Mark Lawson(Individually), Shannon Mallam(In her official capacity as Department of Human Services Child Welfar investigator), Shannon Mallam(Individually), Charles McCall(Individually), Charles McCall(In his official capacity as Speaker of the House/Representative for district 22 for the state of Oklahoma), Jack McCurdy(Individually), Jack McCurdy(In his official capacity as Elected Judge for Canadian County Oklahoma), Tiffany Monte(In her official capacity as Department of Human Services Child Welfare investigator), Tiffany Monte(Individually), Janet Peery(In her official capacity as Chief Executive Officer of the YWCAOKC), Janet Peery(Individually), Candice Shultz(Individually), Candice Shultz(In her official capacity as Legal Secretary for David Halley), Marilyn Stark(In her official capacity as Representative for district 100 for the State of Oklahoma), Marilyn Stark(Individually), Kevin Stitt(In his official capacity as Governor for the State of Oklahoma), Kevin Stitt(Individually), Greg Treat(In his official capacity as President Pro Tempore/Senator for district 47 for the State of Oklahoma), Greg Treat(Individually), Kevin West(Individually), Kevin West(In his official capacity as Representative for district 54 for the State of Oklahoma) filed by David Arndt, David Arndt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Affidavit of Truth, #2 Exhibit 2 - Integris Health, #3 Exhibit 3 - OK Dept of Human Services, #4 Exhibit 4 - Transcript, #5 Exhibit 5 - Transcript, #6 Exhibit 6 - Transcript, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arndt et al v. Hatfield et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Hatfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Treat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilyn Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Peery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Halley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Hixson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Mallam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack McCurdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Echols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Dahm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Hesse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Hughey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Figgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Candice Shultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Stitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacy Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeramy Jarman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Monte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmen Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lonnie Paxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Arndt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?