JK Moulton Enterprises LLC v. TA Operating LLC
Plaintiff: JK Moulton Enterprises LLC
Defendant: TA Operating LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00199
Filed: March 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2020 Filing 12 STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 6/4/2020 09:30 AM in Chambers before Honorable Scott L. Palk. Status Report due by 5/28/2020. (md)
March 31, 2020 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by TA Operating LLC Amended. (Clark, Nathan)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #9 Disclosure Statement - LLC filed by TA Operating LLC. Defendant shall file an amended disclosurestatement in compliance with Local Civil Rule 7.1.1 and with the Courts prior order within seven days of this Order. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 3/30/2020. (md)
March 27, 2020 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by TA Operating LLC . (Clark, Nathan)
March 16, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by TA Operating LLC.(Clark, Nathan)
March 12, 2020 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by JK Moulton Enterprises LLC . (Gould, Tony)
March 10, 2020 Filing 6 Receipt for Money Received from TA Operating LLC in the amount of $400.00, receipt number OKW500078990 regarding #1 Notice of Removal, (rb)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a disclosure statement pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7.1.1 within seven days of this order as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 3/6/2020. (md)
March 5, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Austin T Jackson on behalf of TA Operating LLC (Jackson, Austin)
March 5, 2020 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by TA Operating LLC. (Clark, Nathan)
March 5, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Nathan E Clark on behalf of TA Operating LLC (Clark, Nathan)
March 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2020-638 filed by TA Operating LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - EOA for Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit 2 - Original Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Return of Service for TA, #4 Exhibit 4 - Special Appearance and Reservation of Time for TA, #5 Exhibit 5 - State Court Docket Sheet, #6 Exhibit 6 - Notice of Removal - State Court, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(rb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JK Moulton Enterprises LLC v. TA Operating LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JK Moulton Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Tony Gould
Represented By: Dane J Flesch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TA Operating LLC
Represented By: Nathan E Clark
Represented By: Austin T Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?