Wright v. Barbour et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Christopher Wright
Defendant: Melissa Marie Oaks, Timothy Barbour and Brooks Ray
Case Number: 5:2020cv00201
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Robin J Cauthron
Referring Judge: Jodi W Dishman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Alternative Service by Stephen Christopher Wright. (em)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 3/23/20. (lb)
March 20, 2020 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Stephen Christopher Wright. (em)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER regarding #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall file his supplemental information on or before 3/20/20. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 3/6/20. (lb)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Jodi W. Dishman for all further proceedings. Honorable Robin J. Cauthron no longer assigned to case. Entered at the direction of Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 03/06/20. (wh)
March 5, 2020 Filing 4 ENTER ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Stephen Christopher Wright Motions referred to Suzanne Mitchell. Signed by the direction of Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 3/5/20. (dtb)
March 5, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Stephen Christopher Wright. (dtb)
March 5, 2020 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Complaint titled "Plaintiff's Affidavit in Support of Complaint- Chronological order" by Stephen Christopher Wright. (dtb)
March 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Timothy Barbour, Melissa Marie Oaks, Brooks Ray filed by Stephen Christopher Wright. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dtb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Barbour et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Marie Oaks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Barbour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brooks Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Christopher Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?