Lindahl v. American Multi-Cinema Inc
Plaintiff: Lindahl and Elizabeth Lindahl
Defendant: American Multi-Cinema Inc
Case Number: 5:2020cv00234
Filed: March 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Joe Heaton
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions in limine due 1/15/2021; Jury instructions due 1/15/2021; Voir dire requests due 1/15/2021; Trial briefs due 1/15/2021; Discovery due by 11/1/2020. Jury Trial set on the court's 02/2021 trial docket in Courtroom 501 before Honorable Joe Heaton. Motions due by 11/15/2020. Pretrial Report due by 1/15/2021. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 04/28/2020. (lam)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER parties submitted their joint status report #9 ...in light of the information and agreements in the report the court concludes that the 05/06/2020 status conference is stricken...a scheduling order will be entered separately; initial disclosures are due 05/06/2020. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 04/28/2020. (lam)
April 27, 2020 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew D Schwartz on behalf of Elizabeth Lindahl (Schwartz, Andrew)
April 27, 2020 Filing 9 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff Elizabeth Lindahl. (Schwartz, Andrew)
April 1, 2020 Filing 8 CIVIL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 05/06/2020 @ 09:30 AM in Chambers before Honorable Joe Heaton. The Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan due by 04/27/2020. (lam)
March 16, 2020 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by American Multi-Cinema Inc. (Hopper, Hailey)
March 16, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by American Multi-Cinema Inc.(Hopper, Hailey)
March 16, 2020 Filing 5 Receipt for Money Received from American Multi-Cinema Inc in the amount of $400.00, receipt number OKW500079095 regarding #1 Notice of Removal, (rb)
March 16, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by April D Kelso on behalf of American Multi-Cinema Inc (Kelso, April)
March 16, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by American Multi-Cinema Inc . (Hopper, Hailey)
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Hailey M Hopper on behalf of American Multi-Cinema Inc (Hopper, Hailey)
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2020-808 filed by American Multi-Cinema Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2- Summons, #3 Exhibit 3- Petition, #4 Exhibit Plaintiff's Interrogatories, #5 Exhibit 5- EOA & Reservation of Time, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(rb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lindahl v. American Multi-Cinema Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Lindahl
Represented By: Andrew D Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Multi-Cinema Inc
Represented By: April D Kelso
Represented By: Hailey M Hopper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?