Nowell v. Aldi Inc
Plaintiff: Lisa Nowell
Defendant: Aldi Inc
Case Number: 5:2020cv00239
Filed: March 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2020 Filing 15 ENTER ORDER (Text Only): Upon review of the parties Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan, the Court has entered a Scheduling Order in this case. Therefore, the status conference previously set for May 5, 2020, is STRICKEN. (This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this entry). Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 5/4/2020. (ks)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set on the December 2020 trial docket (12/1/2020 09:00 AM) in Courtroom 503 before Honorable Patrick R Wyrick; Motions to join due 30 days from date of this order; Motions to amend due 30 days from date of this order; Pla expert witness list and expert reports due 10/1/2020; Dft expert witness list and expert reports due 10/11/2020; Pla witness list due 10/1/2020; Dft witness list due 10/11/2020; Pla exhibit list due 10/1/2020; Dft exhibit list due 10/11/2020; Motions in limine due 11/12/2020; Jury instructions due 11/12/2020; Voir dire requests due 11/12/2020; Trial briefs due 11/12/2020; Discovery due by 11/1/2020. Motions due by 10/1/2020. Pretrial Report due by 11/12/2020. Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 4/30/2020. (ks)
April 27, 2020 Filing 13 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff Lisa Nowell. (Reavis, Brett)
March 31, 2020 Filing 12 MAY STATUS & SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 5/5/2020 10:30 AM in Chambers before Honorable Patrick R Wyrick. Status Report due by 4/28/2020. (ks)
March 19, 2020 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew A Ford on behalf of Aldi Inc (Ford, Matthew)
March 19, 2020 Filing 10 STRICKEN ENTRY of Appearance by David L Sargent on behalf of Aldi Inc (Sargent, David) Modified on 3/20/2020. Counsel has refiled their Entry of Appearance using the correct filing signature (ank).
March 19, 2020 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by David L Sargent on behalf of Aldi Inc (Sargent, David)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 and #7 the Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice; David L. Sargent and Matthew Ford are admitted to practice before this Court for the limited purpose of participating in this case on behalf of defendant Aldi, Inc., provided counsel submit an ECF registration form and file an entry of appearance, consistent with LCvR 83.4. Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 3/18/2020. (ks)
March 17, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-3121365 by Aldi Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Req Admiss'n PHV)(Taremi, Mehry)
March 17, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-3121353 by Aldi Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Req for Admiss'n PHV)(Taremi, Mehry)
March 17, 2020 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Aldi Inc . (Taremi, Mehry)
March 17, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3121243. (Taremi, Mehry)
March 17, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel K Jones on behalf of Aldi Inc (Jones, Daniel)
March 17, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Aldi Inc.(Taremi, Mehry)
March 17, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Mehry Taremi on behalf of Aldi Inc (Taremi, Mehry)
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2020-1110 filed by Aldi Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1_OSCN Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2_Petition, #3 Exhibit 3_Summons, #4 Exhibit 4_Summons Served, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(ank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nowell v. Aldi Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Nowell
Represented By: Derek K Burch
Represented By: Brett T Reavis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aldi Inc
Represented By: Mehry Taremi
Represented By: Daniel K Jones
Represented By: David L Sargent
Represented By: Matthew A Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?