Glover v. Midland Credit Management Inc et al
Plaintiff: Ardis Glover
Defendant: Love Beal & Nixon PC and Midland Credit Management Inc
Case Number: 5:2020cv00419
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: David L Russell
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint. Midland Credit Management Inc answer due 7/13/2020. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 7/1/20. (kmt)
June 30, 2020 Filing 7 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Midland Credit Management Inc. (Powell, Courtney)
June 30, 2020 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Courtney Jo Davis Powell on behalf of Midland Credit Management Inc (Powell, Courtney)
June 24, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ardis Glover. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Summons, #2 Exhibit 2 Green Card)(Wandres, Victor)
June 19, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Love Beal & Nixon PC. (kmt)
June 17, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ardis Glover. Midland Credit Management Inc served on 6/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Summons, #2 Exhibit 2 Green Card)(Wandres, Victor)
May 6, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3149151. (Wandres, Victor)
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Midland Credit Management Inc. (kmt)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Love Beal & Nixon PC, Midland Credit Management Inc filed by Ardis Glover. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glover v. Midland Credit Management Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Love Beal & Nixon PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Credit Management Inc
Represented By: Courtney Jo Davis Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ardis Glover
Represented By: Victor R Wandres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?