Erwin et al v. Audie Price Inspection Inc
Plaintiff: Randy Erwin
Defendant: Audie Price Inspection Inc
Case Number: 5:2020cv00506
Filed: June 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Jodi W Dishman
Referring Judge: Stephen P Friot
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma (OKWD) is upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) on Monday, August 3, 2020. Complete information regarding the OKWD NextGen CM/ECF implementation is available at #http://www.okwd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-information.****Currently, you may share a single PACER account with other attorneys in your firm. With the new OKWD NextGen CM/ECF system, sharing of individual PACER accounts is prohibited. You must have an individual upgraded PACER account linked to your e-filing account. Once again, shared PACER accounts cannot be used by OKWD e-filing attorneys. ****Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one is to upgrade your PACER account and step two is to link your upgraded PACER account to the OKWD e-filing account in the upgraded NextGen CM/ECF system. This notice only addresses the first step because the second step cannot be completed until on or after August 3, 2020. ****Many PACER accounts have already been upgraded. The first step is to determine whether you have an "Upgraded" PACER account. If any of the following is true, you have an upgraded PACER account and no action is required until after the OKWD NextGen CM/ECF upgrade on August 3, 2020: 1) You have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or 2) Your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014. If neither of these is true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you can link your PACER account to your new NextGen CM/ECF account. ****OKWDs current CM/ECF system will NOT be available from 11:00 AM on 07/31/20 until 8:00 AM on 08/03/20 due to the upgrade. ****Additional notices will be sent at a later date regarding the second step of this process. If you have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6856 or the OKWD Clerk's Office CM/ECF Help Desk at 405-609-5555. (Pigott, William) (ADI)
July 10, 2020 Filing 16 TELEPHONIC STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 8/10/2020 09:00 AM before Honorable Stephen P. Friot. Status Report due by 8/5/2020. (llg)
July 6, 2020 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Audie Price Inspection Inc . (Good, Paige)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #6 Plaintiff's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Taylor A. Jones, provided that Ms. Jones submits an ECF registration form and files an entry of appearance, consistent with LCvR83.4. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 7/6/2020. (llg)
July 2, 2020 Filing 13 ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 7/2/2020. (rb)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Honorable Jodi W. Dishman recused. Case reassigned to Honorable Stephen P. Friot for all further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 7/2/2020. (rb)
July 2, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Audie Price Inspection Inc.(Good, Paige)
July 2, 2020 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Paige H Good on behalf of Audie Price Inspection Inc (Good, Paige)
July 2, 2020 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Joshua W Solberg on behalf of Audie Price Inspection Inc (Solberg, Joshua)
July 2, 2020 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael Burrage on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Burrage, Michael)
June 25, 2020 Filing 7 ENTER ORDER. This action was filed on June 1, 2020 Doc. No. #1 . Plaintiff's counsel of record offices in Houston, Texas. The Local Rules of this Court require non-resident attorneys who do not maintain an office in Oklahoma to associate with local counsel. LCvR83.3(a). Accordingly, counsel for Plaintiff is directed to comply with this rule or move the Court for relief under LCvR83.3(c) no later than July 2, 2020. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 06/25/2020. (nv)
June 25, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Taylor A. Jones Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-3181102 by Randy Erwin(Individually), Randy Erwin(For Others Similarly Situated). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Application for Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Good Standing)(Josephson, Michael)
June 24, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew W Dunlap on behalf of Randy Erwin(Individually), Randy Erwin(For Others Similarly Situated) (Dunlap, Andrew)
June 24, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Randy Erwin(Individually), Randy Erwin(For Others Similarly Situated). Audie Price Inspection Inc served on 6/11/2020. (Josephson, Michael)
June 19, 2020 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael A Josephson on behalf of Randy Erwin(Individually), Randy Erwin(For Others Similarly Situated) (Josephson, Michael)
June 1, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Audie Price Inspection Inc. (em)
June 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Audie Price Inspection Inc filed by Randy Erwin(Individually), Randy Erwin(For Others Similarly Situated). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Erwin Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(em)
June 1, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3163996. (Josephson, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Erwin et al v. Audie Price Inspection Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audie Price Inspection Inc
Represented By: Joshua W Solberg
Represented By: Paige H Good
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Erwin
Represented By: Michael A Josephson
Represented By: Richard J Burch
Represented By: Andrew W Dunlap
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?