Mitchell v. Lowe's Home Centers LLC
Plaintiff: Mentoria Mitchell
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00522
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Joe Heaton
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions in limine due 03/15/2021; Jury instructions due 03/15/2021; Voir dire requests due 03/15/2021; Trial briefs due 03/15/2021; Discovery due by 2/1/2021. Jury Trial set on the court's 05/2021 trial docket in Courtroom 501 before Honorable Joe Heaton. Motions due by 2/15/2021. Pretrial Report due by 3/15/2021. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 07/30/2020. (lam)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER the status conference set for 08/05/2020 is stricken; initial disclosures if not already made shall be made not later than 08/14/2020; in the event that a confidentiality order is sought as to information or documents produced in discovery the parties should take into account the attached guidelines...see separate scheduling order for specific deadlines and trial setting. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 07/30/2020. (lam)
July 24, 2020 Filing 9 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Defendant Lowe's Home Centers LLC. (Schrag, Jeremy)
July 20, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma (OKWD) is upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) on Monday, August 3, 2020. Complete information regarding the OKWD NextGen CM/ECF implementation is available at #http://www.okwd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-information.****Currently, you may share a single PACER account with other attorneys in your firm. With the new OKWD NextGen CM/ECF system, sharing of individual PACER accounts is prohibited. You must have an individual upgraded PACER account linked to your e-filing account. Once again, shared PACER accounts cannot be used by OKWD e-filing attorneys. ****Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one is to upgrade your PACER account and step two is to link your upgraded PACER account to the OKWD e-filing account in the upgraded NextGen CM/ECF system. This notice only addresses the first step because the second step cannot be completed until on or after August 3, 2020. ****Many PACER accounts have already been upgraded. The first step is to determine whether you have an "Upgraded" PACER account. If any of the following is true, you have an upgraded PACER account and no action is required until after the OKWD NextGen CM/ECF upgrade on August 3, 2020: 1) You have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or 2) Your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014. If neither of these is true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you can link your PACER account to your new NextGen CM/ECF account. ****OKWDs current CM/ECF system will NOT be available from 11:00 AM on 07/31/20 until 8:00 AM on 08/03/20 due to the upgrade. ****Additional notices will be sent at a later date regarding the second step of this process. If you have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6856 or the OKWD Clerk's Office CM/ECF Help Desk at 405-609-5555. (Pigott, William) (ADI)
July 6, 2020 Filing 8 CIVIL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 08/05/2020 @ 09:40 AM in Chambers before Honorable Joe Heaton. Joint Status Report and Joint Discovery Plan due by 07/27/2020. (lam)
June 9, 2020 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Lowe's Home Centers LLC . (Schrag, Jeremy)
June 9, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Lowe's Home Centers LLC.(Schrag, Jeremy)
June 8, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew M Gunn on behalf of Lowe's Home Centers LLC (Gunn, Andrew)
June 5, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Kenyatta R Bethea on behalf of Mentoria Mitchell (Bethea, Kenyatta)
June 4, 2020 Receipt for Money Received from Lowe's Home Centers LLC in the amount of $400.00, receipt number 1087-3166965 regarding #1 Notice of Removal, (rb)
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeremy K Schrag on behalf of Lowe's Home Centers LLC (Schrag, Jeremy)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 ENTER ORDER counsel for the parties are directed to file their entries of appearance conforming to LCvR83.4 not later than 06/08/2020. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 06/04/2020. (lam)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2020-2215 filed by Lowe's Home Centers LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Petition, #2 Exhibit 2- Summons, #3 Exhibit 3- Docket Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(rb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. Lowe's Home Centers LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers LLC
Represented By: Jeremy K Schrag
Represented By: Andrew M Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mentoria Mitchell
Represented By: Kenyatta R Bethea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?