Rosales v. Aargon Agency Inc et al
Plaintiff: Oscar Rosales
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc, Trans Union LLC and Aargon Agency Inc
Case Number: 5:2020cv00536
Filed: June 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Robin J Cauthron
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma (OKWD) is upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) on Monday, August 3, 2020. Complete information regarding the OKWD NextGen CM/ECF implementation is available at #http://www.okwd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-information.****Currently, you may share a single PACER account with other attorneys in your firm. With the new OKWD NextGen CM/ECF system, sharing of individual PACER accounts is prohibited. You must have an individual upgraded PACER account linked to your e-filing account. Once again, shared PACER accounts cannot be used by OKWD e-filing attorneys. ****Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one is to upgrade your PACER account and step two is to link your upgraded PACER account to the OKWD e-filing account in the upgraded NextGen CM/ECF system. This notice only addresses the first step because the second step cannot be completed until on or after August 3, 2020. ****Many PACER accounts have already been upgraded. The first step is to determine whether you have an "Upgraded" PACER account. If any of the following is true, you have an upgraded PACER account and no action is required until after the OKWD NextGen CM/ECF upgrade on August 3, 2020: 1) You have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or 2) Your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014. If neither of these is true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you can link your PACER account to your new NextGen CM/ECF account. ****OKWDs current CM/ECF system will NOT be available from 11:00 AM on 07/31/20 until 8:00 AM on 08/03/20 due to the upgrade. ****Additional notices will be sent at a later date regarding the second step of this process. If you have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6856 or the OKWD Clerk's Office CM/ECF Help Desk at 405-609-5555. (Pigott, William) (ADI)
July 17, 2020 Filing 19 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Experian Information Solutions Inc . (Goodman, Jimmy)
July 17, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint by Aargon Agency Inc.(Vogt, James)
July 17, 2020 Filing 17 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Aargon Agency Inc . (Vogt, James)
July 17, 2020 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by James W Vogt on behalf of Aargon Agency Inc (Vogt, James)
July 17, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Entry of Default as to AARGON AGENCY, INC. by Oscar Rosales. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kerney, Frank)
July 2, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Experian Information Solutions Inc.(Goodman, Jimmy)
July 2, 2020 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Jimmy K Goodman on behalf of Experian Information Solutions Inc (Goodman, Jimmy)
July 2, 2020 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Trans Union LLC . (Givens, Juston)
July 2, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Answer and Defenses) by Trans Union LLC.(Givens, Juston)
July 2, 2020 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Juston R Givens on behalf of Trans Union LLC (Givens, Juston)
June 23, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Oscar Rosales. Aargon Agency Inc served on 6/16/2020. (Kerney, Frank)
June 18, 2020 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Frank H Kerney, III on behalf of Oscar Rosales (Kerney, Frank)
June 18, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Oscar Rosales. Experian Information Solutions Inc served on 6/11/2020. (Kerney, Frank)
June 18, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Oscar Rosales. Trans Union LLC served on 6/11/2020. (Kerney, Frank)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Attorney Frank H. Kerney, III. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 06/15/20. (wh)
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-3171662 by Oscar Rosales. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Application for Admission)(Wandres, Victor)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Victor R Wandres on behalf of Oscar Rosales (Wandres, Victor)
June 9, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3169893. (Wandres, Victor)
June 9, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Aargon Agency Inc, Experian Information Solutions Inc, Trans Union LLC. (em)
June 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aargon Agency Inc, Experian Information Solutions Inc, Trans Union LLC filed by Oscar Rosales. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(em)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosales v. Aargon Agency Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Rosales
Represented By: Victor R Wandres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aargon Agency Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?