Tollett v. Young et al
Plaintiff: Ashlee Tollett
Defendant: Rae Lynn Young and Gary Young
Case Number: 5:2020cv00544
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma (OKWD) is upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) on Monday, August 3, 2020. Complete information regarding the OKWD NextGen CM/ECF implementation is available at #http://www.okwd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-information.****Currently, you may share a single PACER account with other attorneys in your firm. With the new OKWD NextGen CM/ECF system, sharing of individual PACER accounts is prohibited. You must have an individual upgraded PACER account linked to your e-filing account. Once again, shared PACER accounts cannot be used by OKWD e-filing attorneys. ****Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one is to upgrade your PACER account and step two is to link your upgraded PACER account to the OKWD e-filing account in the upgraded NextGen CM/ECF system. This notice only addresses the first step because the second step cannot be completed until on or after August 3, 2020. ****Many PACER accounts have already been upgraded. The first step is to determine whether you have an "Upgraded" PACER account. If any of the following is true, you have an upgraded PACER account and no action is required until after the OKWD NextGen CM/ECF upgrade on August 3, 2020: 1) You have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or 2) Your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014. If neither of these is true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you can link your PACER account to your new NextGen CM/ECF account. ****OKWDs current CM/ECF system will NOT be available from 11:00 AM on 07/31/20 until 8:00 AM on 08/03/20 due to the upgrade. ****Additional notices will be sent at a later date regarding the second step of this process. If you have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6856 or the OKWD Clerk's Office CM/ECF Help Desk at 405-609-5555. (Pigott, William) (ADI)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Jodi W. Dishman for all further proceedings. Honorable Patrick R Wyrick no longer assigned to case. Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 6/23/2020. (ks)
June 18, 2020 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Kindra N Dotson-Avila on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Dotson-Avila, Kindra)
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Rachel L Bussett on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bussett, Rachel)
June 11, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3171464. (Bussett, Rachel)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Ashlee Tollett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- BOE Application, #2 Exhibit 2- Criminal Affidavit Redacted, #3 Exhibit 3- Criminal Information Redacted, #4 Exhibit 4- Court Minute from December 18, 2019, #5 Exhibit 5- Motion to Revoke Bond Redacted, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(dtb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tollett v. Young et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rae Lynn Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashlee Tollett
Represented By: Kindra N Dotson-Avila
Represented By: Patricia A Podolec
Represented By: Rachel L Bussett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?