Barron v. Myers et al
Plaintiff: Derald Barron
Defendant: Lindsey Myers and CSAA General Insurance Company doing business as AAA Insurance
Case Number: 5:2020cv00686
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Jodi W Dishman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 16 PROTECTIVE ORDER. The parties' Joint Motion for Entry of an Agreed Protective Order Doc. No. #15 is granted. Signed by Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 09/03/2020. (nv)
September 2, 2020 Filing 15 JOINT MOTION for Protective Order Agreed by CSAA General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Protective Order)(Woods, Maurice)
August 28, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Dismissal by All Plaintiffs. (Carson, Joseph)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions in limine due 09/07/2021; Jury instructions due 09/07/2021; Voir dire requests due 09/07/2021; Trial briefs due 09/07/2021; Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions due 09/07/2021; Discovery due by 6/7/2021. Jury Trial set for 10/12/2021 09:30 AM in Courtroom 502 before Honorable Jodi W. Dishman. Motions due by 6/7/2021. Pretrial Report due by 9/7/2021. See Scheduling Order for all deadlines and details. Additional deadlines are included within paragraph 21 of Scheduling Order. Signed by Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 08/26/2020. (nv)
August 19, 2020 Filing 12 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff Derald Barron. (Carson, Joseph)
August 19, 2020 Filing 11 ENTER ORDER. The parties' Joint Status Report Doc. No. 10 is hereby STRICKEN due to the inadvertent failure by counsel to redact the name of an individual known to be a minor within the Joint Status Report. The Court of the Clerk is directed to seal Doc. No. 10 . Plaintiff's counsel is directed to re-file the Joint Status Report with all appropriate redactions pursuant to this Court's ECF Policies and Procedures Manual, Section (II)(H)(1)(a)(i) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(a)(3) no later than 5:00 p.m., CST today.. Signed by Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 08/19/2020. (nv)
August 3, 2020 Filing 9 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by All Plaintiffs. (Carson, Joseph)
August 3, 2020 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Joseph S Carson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Carson, Joseph)
July 24, 2020 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by CSAA General Insurance Company . (Chilcoat, Kelsey)
July 24, 2020 Filing 6 STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 8/26/2020 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 502 before the Honorable Jodi W. Dishman. Status Report due by 8/18/2020. (nv)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. A review of the filings in this case reveals that Defendant CSAA General Insurance Company d/b/a AAA Insurance, an Indiana corporation, has not filed a Corporate Disclosure Statement in compliance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1. This Court therefore ORDERS Defendant CSAA General Insurance Company d/b/a AAA Insurance to file within 7 days of this Order its Corporate Disclosure Statement. A civil form called "Corporate Disclosure Form" is available on the website for the United States District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma, under the tab "Forms." Signed by Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 07/20/2020. (nv)
July 16, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400. Receipt: 1087-3193114. (em)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by CSAA General Insurance Company.(Woods, Maurice)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Kelsey A Chilcoat on behalf of CSAA General Insurance Company (Chilcoat, Kelsey)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Maurice G Woods, II on behalf of CSAA General Insurance Company (Woods, Maurice)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2020-138 filed by CSAA General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - OSCN Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Amended Petition, #4 Exhibit 4 - Joint Application for Order Approving Settlement and Dismissal with Prejudice, #5 Exhibit 5 - Order Approving Settlement, #6 Exhibit 6 - Parent-Guardian Release, #7 Exhibit 7 - Dismissal with Prejudice, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(em)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barron v. Myers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindsey Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSAA General Insurance Company doing business as AAA Insurance
Represented By: Maurice G Woods, II
Represented By: Kelsey A Chilcoat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derald Barron
Represented By: Joseph R Homsey, Jr
Represented By: Joseph S Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?