Safety National Casualty Corporation v. SSM Health Care of Oklahoma Inc et al
Plaintiff: Safety National Casualty Corporation
Defendant: SSM Health Care of Oklahoma Inc doing business as St Anthony Hospital, Ryan Stewart, Matthew Bentley Erickson and Chelsea M Stewart
Case Number: 5:2020cv00689
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Jodi W Dishman
Referring Judge: Joe Heaton
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 21 CIVIL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 10/07/2020 @ 09:30 AM in Chambers before Honorable Joe Heaton. Joint Status Report and Joint Discovery Plan due by 9/28/2020. (lam)
August 21, 2020 Filing 20 ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Joe Heaton for all further proceedings. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 08/21/2020. (nv)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Honorable Jodi W. Dishman recused. The Clerk of Court is directed to place this case number in the random draw for reassignment to another Judge of the Court. Signed by Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 08/21/2020. (nv)
August 21, 2020 NOTICE from the Court, The Civil Status/Scheduling Docket Doc. No. #18 set for 09/24/2020 @ 9:30 a.m. is STRICKEN. The deadline for the Joint Status Report set for 09/16/2020 is also STRICKEN. (nv)
August 21, 2020 Filing 18 CIVIL STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 9/24/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 502 before the Honorable Jodi W. Dishman. Status Report due by 9/16/2020. (nv)
August 19, 2020 Filing 17 ENTRY of Appearance by G Thorne Stallings, Jr on behalf of Chelsea M Stewart, Ryan Stewart (Stallings, G)
August 19, 2020 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Jodi W. Dishman: Telephonic Conference held on 8/19/2020. See Minute Sheet for details. (nv)
August 18, 2020 Filing 15 ENTER ORDER. This matter is set for a brief Telephonic Conference on Wednesday, August 19, 2020, at 3:30 p.m. The Court's deputy will contact the parties with further instructions. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 08/18/2020. (nv)
August 18, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Chelsea M Stewart, Ryan Stewart.(George, Lysbeth)
August 18, 2020 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Lysbeth L George on behalf of Chelsea M Stewart, Ryan Stewart (George, Lysbeth)
August 14, 2020 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey D Scott on behalf of Matthew Bentley Erickson, SSM Health Care of Oklahoma Inc (Scott, Jeffrey)
August 14, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by Matthew Bentley Erickson.(Brewer, Michael)
August 14, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by SSM Health Care of Oklahoma Inc.(Brewer, Michael)
August 14, 2020 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael W Brewer on behalf of Matthew Bentley Erickson, SSM Health Care of Oklahoma Inc (Brewer, Michael)
July 30, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safety National Casualty Corporation. SSM Health Care of Oklahoma Inc served on 7/24/2020. (Butler, Roger)
July 30, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safety National Casualty Corporation. Ryan Stewart served on 7/28/2020. (Butler, Roger)
July 30, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safety National Casualty Corporation. Chelsea M Stewart served on 7/28/2020. (Butler, Roger)
July 27, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safety National Casualty Corporation. Matthew Bentley Erickson served on 7/24/2020. (Butler, Roger)
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Safety National Casualty Corporation . (Smith, Nathaniel)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. A review of the filings in this case reveals that Plaintiff Safety National Casualty Corporation, a Missouri corporation, has not filed a Corporate Disclosure Statement in compliance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1. This Court therefore ORDERS Plaintiff Safety National Casualty Corporation to file within seven (7) days of this Order its Corporate Disclosure Statement. A civil form called "Corporate Disclosure Form" is available on the website for the United States District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma, under the tab "Forms." Signed by Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 07/20/2020. (nv)
July 17, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3193662. (Butler, Roger)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Matthew Bentley Erickson, SSM Health Care of Oklahoma Inc, Chelsea M Stewart, Ryan Stewart. (em)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Matthew Bentley Erickson, SSM Health Care of Oklahoma Inc, Chelsea M Stewart, Ryan Stewart filed by Safety National Casualty Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - First Amended Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Policy No. SP 4056516, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(em)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Safety National Casualty Corporation v. SSM Health Care of Oklahoma Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSM Health Care of Oklahoma Inc doing business as St Anthony Hospital
Represented By: Michael W Brewer
Represented By: Jeffrey D Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Stewart
Represented By: Lysbeth L George
Represented By: G Thorne Stallings, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Bentley Erickson
Represented By: Michael W Brewer
Represented By: Jeffrey D Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chelsea M Stewart
Represented By: Lysbeth L George
Represented By: G Thorne Stallings, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Safety National Casualty Corporation
Represented By: Nathaniel T Smith
Represented By: Roger N Butler, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?