AT&T Corp v. JS Harrison LLC
Plaintiff: AT&T Corp
Defendant: JS Harrison LLC d/b/a Algorithm Technologies LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00693
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Bernard Jones
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ~ The Court DIRECTS Plaintiff to show cause on or before September 21, 2020, why the action should not be dismissed, without prejudice, for failure to prosecute its case. Signed by Honorable Bernard M. Jones on 9/10/2020. (dwl)
July 21, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AT&T Corp. JS Harrison LLC served on 7/18/2020. (Phansalkar, Kiran)
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 Receipt for Money Received from AT&T Corp in the amount of $400, receipt number OKW500081063 regarding #1 Complaint (dtb)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by AT&T Corp . (Phansalkar, Kiran)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew D Craig on behalf of AT&T Corp (Craig, Matthew)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Kiran A Phansalkar on behalf of AT&T Corp (Phansalkar, Kiran)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to JS Harrison LLC. (knt)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JS Harrison LLC filed by AT&T Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Master Resale Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(knt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AT&T Corp v. JS Harrison LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JS Harrison LLC d/b/a Algorithm Technologies LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AT&T Corp
Represented By: Matthew D Craig
Represented By: Kiran A Phansalkar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?