Pierce v. Williams et al
Plaintiff: Mark Pierce
Defendant: FNU Williams, FNU Shields, John Lilley Correctional Center and FNU Anderson
Case Number: 5:2020cv00695
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Bernard Jones
Referring Judge: Gary M Purcell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Docket Annotation: Case transferred from Oklahoma Western has been opened in Eastern District of Oklahoma as case 6:20-cv-00284, filed 08/19/2020. (knt)
August 19, 2020 Docket Annotation: CIV-20-695-J electronically transferred to the Eastern District of Oklahoma. (knt)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION ~ The Court ADOPTS the Report and Recommendation #5 and TRANSFERS this case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma. Signed by Honorable Bernard M. Jones on 8/19/2020. (dwl)
August 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE (other) by Mark Pierce (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Copy of Report and Recommendation, #2 Envelope)(knt)
July 20, 2020 Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell no longer assigned to case. (cps)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - The undersigned recommends the transfer of this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma. Objections to R&R due by 8/10/2020. This Report and Recommendation disposes of all issues referred to the undersigned Magistrate Judge in the captioned matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 7/20/2020. (cps)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell. Motions referred to Gary M. Purcell.Signed by the direction of Honorable Bernard Jones on 7/17/20. (knt)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 NO PREVIOUS Cases (knt)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mark Pierce. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(knt)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FNU Anderson, John Lilley Correctional Center, FNU Shields, FNU Williams filed by Mark Pierce. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(knt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pierce v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Lilley Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?