Gibson v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Donna Wardhop Gibson
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Case Number: 5:2020cv00709
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Shon T Erwin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Donna Wardhop Gibson. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration served on 9/3/2020. (Osterhout, Karl)
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Commissioner of the Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (ac)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Order for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 7/27/2020. (mc)
July 23, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Order Appear Without Local Counsel by Donna Wardhop Gibson. (Osterhout, Karl)
July 23, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3198776. (Osterhout, Karl)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Social Security) against Commissioner of the Social Security Administration filed by Donna Wardhop Gibson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(knt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibson v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Wardhop Gibson
Represented By: Karl E Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?