New Oklahoma Investments LLC et al v. Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Linda Elder and New Oklahoma Investments LLC
Defendant: Jack D Owen and Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2020cv00724
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Remand filed by Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Jack D. Owen, #2 Exhibit Emails Between Defendants Counsel and Engel, #3 Exhibit Examples of Interior Apartment Photos, #4 Exhibit Excerpt from Damage Estimate Cover and Recap by Room, #5 Exhibit 7/18/19 Email from Prather to Owen, #6 Exhibit First Amended Petition, #7 Exhibit Petition)(Kaufmann, Linda)
September 22, 2020 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Andre Valentim Farinha on behalf of Jack D Owen (Farinha, Andre)
September 22, 2020 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Andre Valentim Farinha on behalf of Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company (Farinha, Andre)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Defendant Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. Defendant shall file its response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand on or before September 22, 2020. Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 9/14/2020. (ks)
September 11, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company. (Kaufmann, Linda)
August 25, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1. Common Policy Conditions, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Heritage Square Order, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Bynum v. State Farm, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4 - Romero v. Hartford Cas. Ins. Co., #5 Exhibit Ex. 5 - Voyager Indemnity Ins. Co. Policy)(Engel, Adam)
August 7, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company.(Teague, J)
August 4, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE . (Teague, J)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 the unopposed motion of Defendant Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company for extension of time in which to file its answer or other responsive pleading to Plaintiffs' Petition; Defendant shall file its answer or other responsive pleading to Plaintiffs' Petition on or before August 7, 2020. Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 7/29/2020. (ks)
July 29, 2020 Filing 7 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading by Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company. (Teague, J)
July 28, 2020 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company . (Teague, J)
July 28, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Linda G Kaufmann on behalf of Jack D Owen (Kaufmann, Linda)
July 28, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Linda G Kaufmann on behalf of Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company (Kaufmann, Linda)
July 28, 2020 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by J Derrick Teague on behalf of Jack D Owen (Teague, J)
July 28, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by J Derrick Teague on behalf of Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company (Teague, J)
July 28, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3201053. (Teague, J)
July 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The District Court of Comanche County, case number CJ-2020-257 filed by Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Policy Excerpt, #3 Exhibit 3 - Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit 4 - Summons Voyager, #5 Exhibit 5 - Ins Dept Letter, #6 Exhibit 6 - Summons Owen, #7 Exhibit 7 - Answer Owen, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(dtb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New Oklahoma Investments LLC et al v. Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Elder
Represented By: Adam Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Oklahoma Investments LLC
Represented By: Adam Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack D Owen
Represented By: Linda G Kaufmann
Represented By: Andre Valentim Farinha
Represented By: J Derrick Teague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: J Derrick Teague
Represented By: Linda G Kaufmann
Represented By: Andre Valentim Farinha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?