Jones v. Allstate Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Jo Jones
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2020cv00728
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to join due 14 days; Motions to amend due 14 days; Pla expert witness list and expert reports due 5/4/2021; Dft expert witness list and expert reports due 5/18/2021; Pla witness list due 5/18/2021; Pla exhibit list due 5/18/2021; Motions in limine due 8/6/2021; Jury instructions due 8/6/2021; Voir dire requests due 8/6/2021; ADR Completion Date due by 5/29/2021. Discovery due by 7/6/2021. Jury Trial set for 9/14/2021 09:30 AM in Courtroom 301 before Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti. Motions due by 6/4/2021. Pretrial Report due by 8/6/2021.. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 9/21/2020. (mb)
September 17, 2020 Filing 16 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff Jo Jones. (Baker, Ben)
August 21, 2020 Filing 15 DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 9/22/2020 11:30 AM in Chambers before Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti. Status Report due by 9/17/2020. (mb)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney A Mark Smiling terminated. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 8/21/2020. (mb)
August 19, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Allstate Insurance Company. (Smiling, A)
August 11, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Removal. (Walker, Ronald)
August 6, 2020 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel J Medlock on behalf of Jo Jones (Medlock, Daniel)
August 3, 2020 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by David Rusty Smith on behalf of Jo Jones (Smith, David)
August 3, 2020 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael L Barkett on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Barkett, Michael)
August 3, 2020 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Ben D Baker on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Baker, Ben)
July 30, 2020 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Allstate Insurance Company . (Walker, Ronald)
July 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF PENDING MOTIONS by Allstate Insurance Company (Walker, Ronald)
July 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, (Walker, Ronald)
July 30, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3202720. (Walker, Ronald)
July 30, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Allstate Insurance Company.(Walker, Ronald)
July 30, 2020 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Jerry D Noblin, Jr on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company (Noblin, Jerry)
July 30, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Ronald L Walker on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company (Walker, Ronald)
July 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2020-2382 filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiff's Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Return of Service, #4 Exhibit 4 - EOA - Allstate, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(kah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Allstate Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: A Mark Smiling
Represented By: Jerry D Noblin, Jr
Represented By: Ronald L Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jo Jones
Represented By: Ben D Baker
Represented By: Michael L Barkett
Represented By: David Rusty Smith
Represented By: Daniel J Medlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?