Panhandle Eastern Pipeline Company LP v. Tarralbo et al
Plaintiff: Panhandle Eastern Pipeline Company LP
Defendant: Phillips 66 Pipeline LLC, Southern Star Central Gas Pipeline Inc, Mustang Gas Products LLC, DCP Operating Company LP, Koch Hydrocarbon LP, MIT Okla LLC, Dynegy Midstream LLC, Donna Hoehner, Chisholm Pipeline Company, OneOK Plant Transfer LLC, ConocoPhillips Company, Western Electric Cooperative, Plains Pipeline LP, Rodman Gas Processing LLC, Premier Oklahoma Processors I LLC, Phillips Texas Pipeline Company Eagle 2 LLC, Sea Breeze Communication Company, Todd Ward, 20 Acres of Real Estate in Kingfisher County Oklahoma, Anita Tarralbo, Unknown, Cities Service Gas Company and Logan County Rural Water District #2
Case Number: 5:2020cv00751
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 717
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION of Dismissal OF DEFENDANT PLAINS PIPELINE, L.P. AND DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST by All Plaintiffs. (Goodnight, F)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Donna Hoehner, Anita Tarralbo, Todd Ward. (Stiner, John)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plains Pipeline LP answer due 10/1/2020.. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 9/21/2020. (mb)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, #8 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Respond to the Complaint of Plaintiff by Plains Pipeline LP. (Gibbens, Michael)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Panhandle Eastern Pipeline Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Order - WBI v Subsurface Easements)(Goodnight, F)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ryan J. Vershay. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 9/4/2020. (mb)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SUPPLEMENT re #22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3258656 by Panhandle Eastern Pipeline Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Application for Admission PHV)(Goodnight, F)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3258656 by Panhandle Eastern Pipeline Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Goodnight, F)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint by Logan County Rural Water District #2.(Curran, J)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENTRY of Appearance by J Dillon Curran on behalf of Logan County Rural Water District #2 (Curran, J)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by DCP Operating Company LP, MIT Okla LLC . (Robertson, Jayne)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE (other) by DCP Operating Company LP, MIT Okla LLC re #1 Complaint,, of Appearance Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 71.1(e)(1) (Robertson, Jayne)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENTRY of Appearance by Jayne Jarnigan Robertson on behalf of DCP Operating Company LP, MIT Okla LLC (Robertson, Jayne)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Jay W Dobson on behalf of Chisholm Pipeline Company, Phillips 66 Pipeline LLC, Phillips Texas Pipeline Company Eagle 2 LLC (Dobson, Jay)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by Chisholm Pipeline Company, Phillips 66 Pipeline LLC, Phillips Texas Pipeline Company Eagle 2 LLC.(Elias, William)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by William K Elias on behalf of Chisholm Pipeline Company, Phillips 66 Pipeline LLC, Phillips Texas Pipeline Company Eagle 2 LLC (Elias, William)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Joseph H Bocock on behalf of Donna Hoehner, Anita Tarralbo, Todd Ward (Bocock, Joseph)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Donna Hoehner, Anita Tarralbo, Todd Ward.(Stiner, John)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Donna Hoehner, Anita Tarralbo, Todd Ward. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Lease Agreement)(Stiner, John)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by John D Stiner on behalf of Donna Hoehner, Anita Tarralbo, Todd Ward (Stiner, John)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Plains Pipeline LP Disclosure Statement of Plains Pipeline, L.P.. (Gibbens, Michael)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Defendant Plains Pipeline, LP's Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Response or Answer of Plains Pipeline LP due 9/21/2020.. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 8/26/2020. (mb)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Deric J McClellan on behalf of Plains Pipeline LP (McClellan, Deric)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, Respond to the Complaint of Plaintiff by Plains Pipeline LP. (Gibbens, Michael)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael J Gibbens on behalf of Plains Pipeline LP (Gibbens, Michael)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Panhandle Eastern Pipeline Company LP . (Goodnight, F)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by F Jason Goodnight on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Goodnight, F)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AOKWDC-3211965. (Goodnight, F)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Chisholm Pipeline Company, DCP Operating Company LP, Dynegy Midstream LLC, Donna Hoehner, Koch Hydrocarbon LP, Logan County Rural Water District #2, MIT Okla LLC, Mustang Gas Products LLC, OneOK Plant Transfer LLC, Phillips 66 Pipeline LLC, Phillips Texas Pipeline Company Eagle 2 LLC, Sea Breeze Communication Company, Southern Star Central Gas Pipeline Inc, Anita Tarralbo, Todd Ward, Western Electric Cooperative. (kmt)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 20 Acres of Real Estate in Kingfisher County Oklahoma, Chisholm Pipeline Company, DCP Operating Company LP, Dynegy Midstream LLC, Donna Hoehner, Koch Hydrocarbon LP, Logan County Rural Water District #2, MIT Okla LLC, Mustang Gas Products LLC, OneOK Plant Transfer LLC, Phillips 66 Pipeline LLC, Phillips Texas Pipeline Company Eagle 2 LLC, Plains Pipeline LP, Sea Breeze Communication Company, Southern Star Central Gas Pipeline Inc, Anita Tarralbo, Unknown, Todd Ward, Western Electric Cooperative filed by Panhandle Eastern Pipeline Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 t- Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Panhandle Eastern Pipeline Company LP v. Tarralbo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillips 66 Pipeline LLC
Represented By: Jay W Dobson
Represented By: William K Elias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Star Central Gas Pipeline Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mustang Gas Products LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCP Operating Company LP
Represented By: Jayne Jarnigan Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koch Hydrocarbon LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIT Okla LLC
Represented By: Jayne Jarnigan Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynegy Midstream LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Hoehner
Represented By: John D Stiner
Represented By: Joseph H Bocock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chisholm Pipeline Company
Represented By: Jay W Dobson
Represented By: William K Elias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OneOK Plant Transfer LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConocoPhillips Company
Represented By: Jay W Dobson
Represented By: William K Elias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Electric Cooperative
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plains Pipeline LP
Represented By: Michael J Gibbens
Represented By: Deric J McClellan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodman Gas Processing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Oklahoma Processors I LLC
Represented By: Jayne Jarnigan Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillips Texas Pipeline Company Eagle 2 LLC
Represented By: Jay W Dobson
Represented By: William K Elias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sea Breeze Communication Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Ward
Represented By: John D Stiner
Represented By: Joseph H Bocock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 20 Acres of Real Estate in Kingfisher County Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anita Tarralbo
Represented By: John D Stiner
Represented By: Joseph H Bocock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cities Service Gas Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logan County Rural Water District #2
Represented By: J Dillon Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Panhandle Eastern Pipeline Company LP
Represented By: F Jason Goodnight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?