Phinisee v. Experian Information Solutions Inc et al
Plaintiff: Tina Phinisee
Defendant: Enhanced Recovery Company LLC, Experian Information Solutions Inc and Transunion LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00767
Filed: August 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Thomas A Creekmore, III on behalf of Enhanced Recovery Company LLC (Creekmore, Thomas)
September 17, 2020 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Enhanced Recovery Company LLC . (Wagner, Katie)
September 17, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Enhanced Recovery Company LLC.(Wagner, Katie)
September 17, 2020 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Katie N Wagner on behalf of Enhanced Recovery Company LLC (Wagner, Katie)
September 2, 2020 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Hilary H Clifton on behalf of Transunion LLC (Clifton, Hilary)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #7 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer. Enhanced Recovery Company LLC answer due 9/17/2020.. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 9/1/20. (kmt)
September 1, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION by All Plaintiffs. (Hill, Tiffany)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Transunion LLC . (Givens, Juston)
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint and Defenses by Transunion LLC.(Givens, Juston)
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Juston R Givens on behalf of Transunion LLC (Givens, Juston)
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tina Phinisee. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Experian Delivery Confirmation, #2 Exhibit Experian Return Receipt, #3 Exhibit TransUnion Delivery Confirmation, #4 Exhibit TransUnion Return Receipt, #5 Exhibit Enhanced Recovery Delivery Confirmation, #6 Exhibit Enhanced Recovery Return Receipt)(Hill, Tiffany)
August 6, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AOKWDC-3214394. (Hill, Tiffany)
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Enhanced Recovery Company LLC, Experian Information Solutions Inc, Transunion LLC. (kmt)
August 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Enhanced Recovery Company LLC, Experian Information Solutions Inc, Transunion LLC filed by Tina Phinisee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phinisee v. Experian Information Solutions Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enhanced Recovery Company LLC
Represented By: Thomas A Creekmore, III
Represented By: Katie N Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transunion LLC
Represented By: Juston R Givens
Represented By: Hilary H Clifton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Phinisee
Represented By: Tiffany L Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?