Brown v. Wardman et al
Plaintiff: Mackenzie Brown
Defendant: Sun Valley Inc and Roger Wardman
Case Number: 5:2020cv00771
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Robin J Cauthron
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/1/2021. Jury Trial set for 8/10/2021 @ 09:00 AM in Courtroom 501 before Honorable Robin J. Cauthron. (SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL SCHEDULING DATES). Entered at the direction of Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 09/01/20. (wh)
August 27, 2020 Filing 9 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Mackenzie Brown. (Cain, Monty)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 9/1/2020 @ 10:20 AM in Chambers before Honorable Robin J. Cauthron. NO APPEARANCE WILL BE REQUIRED IF COUNSEL ARE IN AGREEMENT WITH THE DISCOVERY CUT-OFF DATE, AND THE COURT WILL ISSUE A SCHEDULING ORDER CONSISTENT WITH THE JOINT STATUS REPORT. IF COUNSEL ARE NOT IN AGREEMENT WITH THE DISCOVERY CUT-OFF DATE, THE PARTIES MAY APPEAR BY TELEPHONE OR IN PERSON, OBSERVING ALL REQUIREMENTS ON THE COURTS WEBSITE REGARDING COVID-19. (wh)
August 13, 2020 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Lauren M Langford on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Langford, Lauren)
August 12, 2020 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Sun Valley Inc . (Schreck, Charles)
August 12, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Roger Wardman.(Schreck, Charles)
August 7, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Monty L Cain on behalf of Mackenzie Brown (Cain, Monty)
August 5, 2020 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Peter L Wheeler on behalf of All Defendants (Wheeler, Peter)
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Charles A Schreck on behalf of All Defendants (Schreck, Charles)
August 5, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AOKWDC-3212542. (Schreck, Charles)
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Grady County, case number CJ-2020-95 filed by Sun Valley Inc, Roger Wardman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Accident Report from OHP (rec.7.15.20), #2 Exhibit 2 - OSCN Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit 3 - Petition, #4 Exhibit 4 - Summons Sun Valley, #5 Exhibit 5 - Summons Wardman, #6 Exhibit 6 - EOA of Cain, Alfonso and Langford for Plaintiff, #7 Exhibit 7 - ROS on Defendant Sun Valley, #8 Exhibit 8 - EOA and ROT, #9 Exhibit 9 - Notice by Publication (Filed 7.10.20), #10 Exhibit 10 - Sun Valley's Corrected Reservation of Time (filed 7.16.20), #11 Exhibit 11 - Return of Service on Wardman on 7-12, #12 Exhibit 12 - ROT for Wardman (filed 7.31.20), #13 Exhibit 13 - Answer of Sun Valley (filed 7.31.20), #14 Exhibit 14 - Consent to Removal, #15 Civil Cover Sheet)(em)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Wardman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mackenzie Brown
Represented By: Monty L Cain
Represented By: Lauren M Langford
Represented By: Anthony M Alfonso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Valley Inc
Represented By: Peter L Wheeler
Represented By: Charles A Schreck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Wardman
Represented By: Peter L Wheeler
Represented By: Charles A Schreck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?