Muonelo v. Loancare LLC
Plaintiff: Chioma Muonelo
Defendant: Loancare LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00805
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 7 NOVEMBER STATUS & SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 11/3/2020 11:10 AM in Courtroom 503 before Honorable Patrick R Wyrick. Status Report due by 10/27/2020. (ks)
September 8, 2020 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Loancare LLC . (Zschiesche, Raymond)
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Loancare LLC.(Zschiesche, Raymond)
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Raymond E Zschiesche on behalf of Loancare LLC (Zschiesche, Raymond)
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chioma Muonelo. All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Hill, Tiffany)
August 14, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AOKWDC-3227484. (Hill, Tiffany)
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Loancare LLC. (dtb)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Loancare LLC filed by Chioma Muonelo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dtb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muonelo v. Loancare LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chioma Muonelo
Represented By: Tiffany L Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loancare LLC
Represented By: Raymond E Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?