Progressive Northern Insurance Company v. Stripling et al
Plaintiff: Progressive Northern Insurance Company
Defendant: Stephanie Rae Roberts, Nicholas Ray Johnson, Luis M Camacho-Cadena and Michael Stripling
Case Number: 5:2020cv00821
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Progressive Northern Insurance Company. Luis M Camacho-Cadena served on 8/25/2020. (Goeres, Dawn)
September 29, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Progressive Northern Insurance Company. Nicholas Ray Johnson served on 9/3/2020. (Goeres, Dawn)
September 29, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Progressive Northern Insurance Company. Michael Stripling served on 8/24/2020. (Goeres, Dawn)
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Defendant Stephanie Rae Roberts. Stephanie Rae Roberts waiver sent on 8/31/2020, answer due 10/30/2020. (Goeres, Dawn)
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to Nicholas Ray Johnson. (dtb)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Luis M Camacho-Cadena, Michael Stripling. (dtb)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Progressive Northern Insurance Company . (Roberson, Brad)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Dawn M Goeres on behalf of Progressive Northern Insurance Company (Goeres, Dawn)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Brad L Roberson on behalf of Progressive Northern Insurance Company (Roberson, Brad)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Progressive Northern Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Police Report Redacted, #2 Exhibit 2- Certified Policy, #3 Exhibit 3- Letter to Progressive, #4 Exhibit 4- Letter to Progressive, #5 Exhibit 5- Letter form Progressive, #6 Exhibit 6- Demand Letter, #7 Exhibit 7- Claim Information, #8 Exhibit 8- Claim Information, #9 Exhibit 9- Letter form Progressive, #10 Civil Cover Sheet) (dtb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Progressive Northern Insurance Company v. Stripling et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Progressive Northern Insurance Company
Represented By: Dawn M Goeres
Represented By: Brad L Roberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Rae Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Ray Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis M Camacho-Cadena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Stripling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?