Baker v. Allstate Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Kathryn Baker
Defendant: Christopher Harlan and Allstate Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2020cv00822
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: David L Russell
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying as moot #12 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying as moot #14 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 10/6/20. (jw)
September 4, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AOKWDC-3265122. (Baker, Ben)
September 4, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Adam Wiens Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3264492 by Christopher Harlan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice - Wiens)(Givens, Juston)
September 4, 2020 Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by Juston R Givens on behalf of Christopher Harlan (Givens, Juston)
September 4, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Christopher Harlan, P.E. ONLY by Kathryn Baker. (Baker, Ben)
September 3, 2020 NOTICE from the Court that #16 Stipulation of Dismissal is STRICKEN due to counsel's failure to comply with Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (em)
September 3, 2020 Filing 16 STRICKEN STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Christopher Harlan, P.E. ONLY by Kathryn Baker. (Baker, Ben)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Mr. Wiens is granted until September 8, 2020, to show association with local counsel as required by LCvR83.3(a), as more fully set out. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 8/25/20. (jw)
August 24, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b) by Christopher Harlan. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Wiens, Adam)
August 24, 2020 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Adam Byron Wiens on behalf of Christopher Harlan (Wiens, Adam)
August 24, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings for Fraudulent Joinder by Allstate Insurance Company. (Walker, Ronald)
August 20, 2020 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Allstate Insurance Company . (Walker, Ronald)
August 18, 2020 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel J Medlock on behalf of Kathryn Baker (Medlock, Daniel)
August 18, 2020 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by David Rusty Smith on behalf of Kathryn Baker (Smith, David)
August 18, 2020 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Ben D Baker on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Baker, Ben)
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael L Barkett on behalf of Kathryn Baker (Barkett, Michael)
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF PENDING MOTIONS by Allstate Insurance Company (Walker, Ronald)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, (Walker, Ronald)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Allstate Insurance Company.(Walker, Ronald)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Jerry D Noblin, Jr on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company (Noblin, Jerry)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Ronald L Walker on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company (Walker, Ronald)
August 17, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AOKWDC-3229835. (Walker, Ronald)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2020-3318 filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit and Return of Service - Christopher Harlan, #3 Exhibit 3 - State Court Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit 4 - Memorandum Opinion and Order, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Allstate Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Harlan
Represented By: Adam Byron Wiens
Represented By: Juston R Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Ronald L Walker
Represented By: Jerry D Noblin, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Baker
Represented By: David Rusty Smith
Represented By: Michael L Barkett
Represented By: Ben D Baker
Represented By: Daniel J Medlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?