Mason et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Terry Humphrey, Janet Humphrey, Kelsey Mason and Austin Mason
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 5:2020cv00823
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Bernard Jones
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 5 STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Status Conference set for 11/5/2020 10:40 AM in Rm 2017 before Honorable Bernard M. Jones. Status Report due by 10/26/2020. (dwl)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Leffel, Lance)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company . (Leffel, Lance)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Lance E Leffel on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Leffel, Lance)
August 18, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE /Notice of Removal Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AOKWDC-3231325. (Leffel, Lance)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Lincoln County District Court, case number CJ-2020-00080 filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Civil Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons/Service, #4 Exhibit 4 - SF Annual Report, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(knt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mason et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Humphrey
Represented By: Jim W Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Humphrey
Represented By: Jim W Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelsey Mason
Represented By: Jim W Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Austin Mason
Represented By: Jim W Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Lance E Leffel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?