Brand v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Stephen Lee Brand
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2020cv00824
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Stephen P Friot
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to join due 11/1/2020; Motions to amend due 11/1/2020; Pla expert witness list and expert reports due 3/20/2021; Dft expert witness list and expert reports due 21 days t/a; Pla witness list due 4/10/2021; Dft witness list due 14 days t/a; Pla exhibit list due 4/10/2021; Dft exhibit list due 14 days t/a; Motions in limine due 7/20/2021; Jury instructions & verdict forms due 7/20/2021; Voir dire requests due 7/20/2021; Trial briefs due 7/20/2021; Case Referred to Mediator; ADR Completion Date 4/15/2021. Discovery due by 7/15/2021. Jury Trial set for 8/10/2021 09:30 AM in Courtroom 401 before Honorable Stephen P. Friot. Dispositive & Daubert Motions due by 5/1/2021. Pretrial Report due by 7/20/2021. Entered at the direction of Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 10/7/2020. (llg)
October 1, 2020 NOTICE from the Court STRIKING #17 Entry of Appearance as it was filed using the wrong attorney's ECF login. The Entry of Appearance has been correctly filed at doc. no. 18. (llg)
September 30, 2020 Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by Dustin J Vanderhoof on behalf of Stephen Lee Brand (Vanderhoof, Dustin)
September 30, 2020 Filing 17 (STRICKEN by 10/1/2020 Notice from the Court) ENTRY of Appearance by Lawrence R Murphy, Jr on behalf of Stephen Lee Brand (Murphy, Lawrence) Modified on 10/1/2020 (llg).
September 30, 2020 Filing 16 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff Stephen Lee Brand. (Murphy, Lawrence)
September 30, 2020 NOTICE from the Court STRIKING #15 Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan as it has been filed by an attorney who is not an attorney of record in this case. (Further, it does not list on the front page the attorney that the court has been advised will participate in the status/scheduling conference on behalf of the plaintiff, namely Lawrence J. Murphy, Jr.) Plaintiff is DIRECTED to correct these deficiencies and refile the Joint Status Report. (llg)
September 30, 2020 Filing 15 (STRICKEN by 9/30/2020 Notice from the Court) JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff Stephen Lee Brand. (Vanderhoof, Dustin) Modified on 9/30/2020 (llg).
September 17, 2020 Filing 14 STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/7/2020 10:00 AM before Honorable Stephen P. Friot. Status Report due by 10/5/2020. (llg)
August 21, 2020 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Lawrence R Murphy, Jr on behalf of Stephen Lee Brand (Murphy, Lawrence)
August 21, 2020 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Laura L Hamilton on behalf of Stephen Lee Brand (Hamilton, Laura)
August 21, 2020 Filing 11 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Stephen Lee Brand. (Smolen, Donald)
August 21, 2020 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Donald E Smolen, II on behalf of Stephen Lee Brand (Smolen, Donald)
August 20, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ntc to State Court of Removal, #2 Exhibit Notice of Removal)(Acquaviva, Joseph)
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Elizabeth A Snowden on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Snowden, Elizabeth)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company . (Acquaviva, Joseph)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Acquaviva, Joseph)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Petition) by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Acquaviva, Joseph)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Petition. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company answer or other responsive pldg due 8/20/2020. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 8/19/2020. (llg)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Petition by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Acquaviva, Joseph)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Joseph T Acquaviva, Jr on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Acquaviva, Joseph)
August 18, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AOKWDC-3231667. (Acquaviva, Joseph)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The District Court in and for Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2020-3187 filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2- Petition, #3 Exhibit 3- Return of Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (dtb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brand v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Elizabeth A Snowden
Represented By: Joseph T Acquaviva, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Lee Brand
Represented By: Donald E Smolen, II
Represented By: Laura L Hamilton
Represented By: Lawrence R Murphy, Jr
Represented By: Dustin J Vanderhoof
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?