Chapman v. Board of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County et al
Plaintiff: Cait Chapman
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County, PD Taylor and Joseph Hedderman
Case Number: 5:2020cv00825
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave TO FILE SURREPLY AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT by Cait Chapman. (Scott, Colton)
October 9, 2020 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by PD Taylor. (Etherington, Aaron)
October 5, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint BY DEFENDANT JOSEPH HEDDERMAN filed by Cait Chapman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Probable Cause, #2 Exhibit 2 - First Emergency Joint Order Re Covid-19, #3 Exhibit 3 - Third Emergency Joint Order Re Covid-19)(Scott, Colton)
October 5, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint BY DEFENDANT P.D. TAYLOR IN HIS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY AS SHERIFF OF OKLAHOMA COUNTY filed by Cait Chapman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Probable Cause)(Scott, Colton)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying as moot #3 Motion to Dismiss; denying #4 Motion to Dismiss; denying #9 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 9/21/2020. (mb)
September 14, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Joseph Hedderman. (Heggy, Rodney)
September 14, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by PD Taylor. (Heggy, Rodney)
September 9, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE (other) by Cait Chapman of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Board of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County, Only (Scott, Colton)
September 8, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Joseph Hedderman, PD Taylor filed by Cait Chapman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Tort Claim)(Scott, Colton)
August 26, 2020 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Rodney J Heggy on behalf of Joseph Hedderman (Heggy, Rodney)
August 26, 2020 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Aaron C Etherington on behalf of Joseph Hedderman (Etherington, Aaron)
August 26, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Joseph Hedderman. (Etherington, Aaron)
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Darrell W Downs on behalf of Cait Chapman (Downs, Darrell)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Colton G Scott on behalf of Cait Chapman (Scott, Colton)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 Receipt for Money Received from Cait Chapman in the amount of $400.00, receipt number OKW500081516 regarding #1 Notice of Removal, (kah)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Aaron C Etherington on behalf of Board of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County, PD Taylor (Etherington, Aaron)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by PD Taylor. (Heggy, Rodney)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by Board of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County. (Heggy, Rodney)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Rodney J Heggy on behalf of Board of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County (Heggy, Rodney)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2020-1924 filed by PD Taylor, Board of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Docket CJ-2020-1924 (Chapman), #2 Exhibit 2 Petition CJ-2020-1924 (Chapman), #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chapman v. Board of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County
Represented By: Aaron C Etherington
Represented By: Rodney J Heggy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PD Taylor
Represented By: Aaron C Etherington
Represented By: Rodney J Heggy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Hedderman
Represented By: Aaron C Etherington
Represented By: Rodney J Heggy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cait Chapman
Represented By: Colton G Scott
Represented By: Darrell W Downs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?